EP2082359 - METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUSTOMISING A PORTABLE ELECTRONIC ENTITY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Opposition rejected Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 23.03.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.05.2022 | Opposition rejected | published on 22.06.2022 [2022/25] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Oberthur Technologies 420, rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2013/43] | For all designated states Oberthur Technologies 420 rue d'Estienne d'Orves 92700 Colombes / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states OBERTHUR TECHNOLOGIES 50, Quai Michelet 92300 Levallois-Perret / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOUNIER, Régis 127, avenue Jean-Baptiste Clément 92100 Boulogne-Billancourt / FR | 02 /
LOUIS, Jean-Marc 9, rue de l'Ecole des Femmes 95220 Herblay / FR | [2009/31] | Representative(s) | Santarelli Tour Trinity 1 bis Esplanade de la Défense 92035 Paris La Défense Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2014/34] | Santarelli 49, avenue des Champs Elysées 75008 Paris / FR | ||
Former [2013/43] | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | ||
Former [2009/31] | Quantin, Bruno Marie Henri Santarelli 14 Avenue de la Grande Armée B.P. 237 75822 Paris Cedex 17 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07866468.7 | 30.10.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007FR01799 | Priority number, date | FR20060054767 | 07.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0654767 | [2009/31] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008065265 | Date: | 05.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/23] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2082359 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 05.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082359 | Date: | 23.10.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 17.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G06K17/00 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
G06K17/00 (EP,US);
G06K19/07716 (EP,US);
G06Q20/341 (EP,US);
G06Q20/3552 (EP,US);
G07F7/08 (EP,US);
G07F7/1008 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND EINRICHTUNG ZUM ANPASSEN EINER TRAGBAREN ELEKTRONISCHEN ENTITÄT | [2009/31] | English: | METHOD AND DEVICE FOR CUSTOMISING A PORTABLE ELECTRONIC ENTITY | [2009/31] | French: | PROCEDE ET DISPOSITIF DE PERSONNALISATION D'UNE ENTITE ELECTRONIQUE PORTABLE | [2009/31] | Entry into regional phase | 04.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 19.06.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 09.09.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 09.09.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 19.06.2013 | Opposition(s) | Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.2014
29.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke+Devrient Mobile Security GmbH Prinzregentenstraße 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | [2022/13] |
Former [2017/27] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.2014
29.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Klunker IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Destouchesstraße 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2017/08] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.2014
29.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE Opponent's representative Metzler, Volker Klunker Schmitt-Nilson Hirsch Patentanwälte Destouchesstrasse 68 80796 München / DE | ||
Former [2014/36] | |||
Opponent(s) | 01
22.07.2014
29.07.2014
ADMISSIBLE Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | 29.08.2014 | Invitation to proprietor to file observations on the notice of opposition | 27.02.2015 | Reply of patent proprietor to notice(s) of opposition | 16.02.2017 | Date of oral proceedings | 24.03.2017 | Despatch of minutes of oral proceedings | 24.03.2017 | Date of despatch of rejection of opposition | 15.02.2022 | Legal effect of rejection of opposition [2022/25] | Appeal following opposition | 23.05.2017 | Appeal received No. T1268/17 | 15.02.2022 | Result of appeal procedure: appeal of the opponent was rejected | 04.05.2022 | Despatch of the decision of the Board of Appeal | 15.02.2022 | Date of oral proceedings | 04.03.2022 | Minutes of the oral proceedings despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 24.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.10.2007 | AT | 23.10.2013 | BG | 23.10.2013 | CY | 23.10.2013 | CZ | 23.10.2013 | DK | 23.10.2013 | EE | 23.10.2013 | FI | 23.10.2013 | LT | 23.10.2013 | LV | 23.10.2013 | MC | 23.10.2013 | MT | 23.10.2013 | NL | 23.10.2013 | RO | 23.10.2013 | SE | 23.10.2013 | SI | 23.10.2013 | SK | 23.10.2013 | IE | 30.10.2013 | LU | 30.10.2013 | BE | 31.10.2013 | CH | 31.10.2013 | LI | 31.10.2013 | GR | 24.01.2014 | IS | 23.02.2014 | PT | 24.02.2014 | [2016/28] |
Former [2015/41] | HU | 30.10.2007 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
MT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
LU | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/38] | HU | 30.10.2007 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
GR | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
LU | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/34] | HU | 30.10.2007 | |
AT | 23.10.2013 | ||
BG | 23.10.2013 | ||
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
LU | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/14] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SI | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
IE | 30.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/41] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
DK | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
BE | 31.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
RO | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
SK | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
EE | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/34] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
CH | 31.10.2013 | ||
LI | 31.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/33] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
MC | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
PT | 24.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
CY | 23.10.2013 | ||
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
LV | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 23.10.2013 | |
FI | 23.10.2013 | ||
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
IS | 23.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 23.10.2013 | |
LT | 23.10.2013 | ||
NL | 23.10.2013 | ||
SE | 23.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 23.10.2013 | Cited in | International search | [XA]EP1434168 (NAGRACARD SA [CH]) [X] 1-22,41 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0019] * * paragraph [0020] * * claims 1,2 * [A] 36; | [DA]US6196459 (GOMAN ROBERT NEAL [US], et al) [DA] 29 * column 2, lines 4-14 * * column 5, line 48 - line 62 * * figure 3 *; | [DA]US6575360 (HAGN THOMAS [DE]) [DA] 4-6 * paragraph [0031] *; | [A]EP1376453 (TOSHIBA KK [JP]) [A] 23-28,30-34,38,39,42,43 * claim 6 * |