EP2084125 - AMINOBENZOCYCLOHEPTENE DERIVATIVES, METHODS FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND USES THEREOF IN THERAPY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 16.11.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Université de Haute Alsace 2 Rue des Frères Lumière 68093 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | For all designated states Université Louis Pasteur 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67070 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (C.N.R.S.) 3 rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Universite De Haute Alsace 2 Rue des Frères Lumière 68093 Mulhouse Cedex / FR | ||
For all designated states Université Louis Pasteur 4, rue Blaise Pascal 67070 Strasbourg Cedex / FR | |||
For all designated states Centre National de la Recherche Scientifique (CNRS) 3, rue Michel-Ange 75794 Paris Cedex 16 / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
TARNUS-RONDEAU, Céline 2, impasse du Pressoir 68170 Rixheim / FR | 02 /
DEFOIN, Albert 8 impasse des Roses 68440 Habsheim / FR | 03 /
ALBRECHT, Sébastien 30, rue du Manége 68100 Mulhouse / FR | 04 /
MAIEREANU, Anamaria 4 rue des Cigognes 67000 Strasbourg / FR | 05 /
FAUX, Nadège 15, rue louise 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | 06 /
PALE, Patrick 23, Rue Lovisa 67000 Strasbourg / FR | [2010/47] |
Former [2009/32] | 01 /
TARNUS-RONDEAU, Céline 2, impasse du Pressoir 68170 Rixheim / FR | ||
02 /
DEFOIN, Albert 30 rue du Manège 68100 Mulhouse / FR | |||
03 /
ALBRECHT, Sébastien 30, rue du Manége 68100 Mulhouse / FR | |||
04 /
MAIEREANU, Anamaria 4 rue des Cigognes 67000 Strasbourg / FR | |||
05 /
FAUX, Nadège 15, rue louise 67300 Schiltigheim / FR | |||
06 /
PALE, Patrick 23, Rue Lovisa 67000 Strasbourg / FR | Representative(s) | Oudin, Stéphane GUIU IP 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2012/02] | Oudin, Stéphane JurisPatent Dijon - Cabinet GUIU 10, Rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | ||
Former [2009/32] | Oudin, Stéphane JurisPatent Cabinet Claude Guiu 10, rue Paul Thénard 21000 Dijon / FR | Application number, filing date | 07866480.2 | 31.10.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007FR01812 | Priority number, date | FR20060009615 | 03.11.2006 Original published format: FR 0609615 | [2009/32] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008059141 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/21] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2084125 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084125 | Date: | 11.01.2012 | Language: | FR | [2012/02] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 22.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07C225/22, C07C323/30, A61K31/135, A61P35/00 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
C07C225/20 (EP,US);
A61P35/00 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
C07C319/14 (EP,US);
C07C319/20 (EP,US);
C07C323/30 (EP,US);
| C-Set: |
C07C319/14, C07C323/30 (US,EP);
C07C319/20, C07C323/30 (EP,US) | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | AMINOBENZOCYCLOHEPTENDERIVATE, VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG UND DEREN VERWENDUNG IN DER THERAPIE | [2009/32] | English: | AMINOBENZOCYCLOHEPTENE DERIVATIVES, METHODS FOR PREPARING THE SAME AND USES THEREOF IN THERAPY | [2009/32] | French: | DERIVES D'AMINOBENZOCYCLOHEPTENE, LEURS PROCEDES DE PREPARATION ET LEUR UTILISATION EN THERAPEUTIQUE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 29.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 13.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.07.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.11.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 25.11.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 13.11.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.10.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/51] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 31.10.2007 | AT | 11.01.2012 | CY | 11.01.2012 | CZ | 11.01.2012 | DK | 11.01.2012 | EE | 11.01.2012 | FI | 11.01.2012 | IE | 11.01.2012 | IT | 11.01.2012 | LT | 11.01.2012 | LV | 11.01.2012 | MT | 11.01.2012 | NL | 11.01.2012 | PL | 11.01.2012 | RO | 11.01.2012 | SE | 11.01.2012 | SI | 11.01.2012 | SK | 11.01.2012 | TR | 11.01.2012 | BG | 11.04.2012 | GR | 12.04.2012 | ES | 22.04.2012 | IS | 11.05.2012 | PT | 11.05.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
TR | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
MT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
ES | 22.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 11.01.2012 | |
CY | 11.01.2012 | ||
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
IT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
SK | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
CZ | 11.01.2012 | ||
DK | 11.01.2012 | ||
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
RO | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
EE | 11.01.2012 | ||
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SE | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IE | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 11.01.2012 | |
FI | 11.01.2012 | ||
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
LV | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | FI | 11.01.2012 | |
LT | 11.01.2012 | ||
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
PL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
PT | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
GR | 12.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
NL | 11.01.2012 | ||
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
BG | 11.04.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 11.01.2012 | |
SI | 11.01.2012 | ||
IS | 11.05.2012 | ||
Former [2012/25] | SI | 11.01.2012 | Cited in | International search | [A]WO9966934 (ELAN PHARM INC [US], et al) [A] 1,20 * page 93; examples 2-B *; | [AD] - CELINE TARNUS ET AL, "3-Amino-2-tetralone Derivatives : Novel Potent and Selective Inhibitors of Aminopeptidase-M (EC 3.4.11.2)", ARCH. BIOCHEM. BIOPHYS., (1994), vol. 311, no. 1, pages 42 - 46, XP002444119 [AD] 1,21 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1006/abbi.1994.1206 | [A] - BEILSTEIN, BEILSTEIN INSTITUTE FOR ORGANIC CHEMISTRY, FRANKFURT-MAIN, DE, Database accession no. 3751986, XP002444121 [A] 1 * column A * | [ ] - CHEMICAL ABSTRACTS, (1960), vol. 54, no. 2, Database accession no. 3353 [ ] * column A * |