EP2040758 - BIORESPONSIVE POLYMERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.06.2015 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Interface Biologics Inc. 200-101 College Street Mars South Tower Toronto, Ontario M5G 1L7 / CA | [2009/14] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LARONDE, Frank 902-218 Queen's Quay West Toronto, Ontario, M5J 2Y6 / CA | 02 /
CHEN, Hanje 102 Risebrough Avenue Toronto, Ontario, M2M 2E3 / CA | [2009/14] | Representative(s) | Lahrtz, Fritz Patentanwälte Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler PartG mbB Prinzregentenstraße 68 81675 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/14] | Lahrtz, Fritz Isenbruck Bösl Hörschler Wichmann Huhn LLP Patentanwälte Prinzregentenstrasse 68 81675 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07866602.1 | 29.06.2007 | [2009/14] | WO2007IB04228 | Priority number, date | US20060817822P | 30.06.2006 Original published format: US 817822 P | [2009/14] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008053362 | Date: | 08.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/19] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2040758 | Date: | 01.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 08.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/14] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/48, C08G69/00, A61K9/00, A61L15/44, A61L15/64, A61L27/54, A61L27/58, A61L29/14, A61L29/16, A61L31/14, A61L31/16, A61P29/00, A61P21/02, A61P9/00, C08G69/48, C08J5/00, C08L101/16 | [2014/38] | CPC: |
A61K47/56 (EP,US);
A61K47/58 (EP,US);
A61K47/61 (EP,US);
A61K47/62 (EP,US);
A61K47/65 (EP,US);
A61P21/02 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2011/26] | C08G69/00, A61K47/48, A61K9/00, A61L15/44, A61L15/64, A61L27/54, A61L27/58, A61L29/14, A61L29/16, A61L31/14, A61L31/16, A61P29/00, A61P21/02, A61P9/00, C08G69/48, C08J5/00, C08L101/16 | ||
Former IPC [2009/14] | A61K47/48 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/14] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BIORESPONSIVE POLYMERE | [2009/14] | English: | BIORESPONSIVE POLYMERS | [2009/14] | French: | POLYMERES BIOSENSIBLES | [2009/14] | Entry into regional phase | 29.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 29.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/14] | 06.01.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/30] | 13.02.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/30] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.06.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.06.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.06.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0064486 (VERITAS MEDICAL TECHNOLOGIES I [US]) [A] 1-15* page 37, line 9 - page 39, line 10 *; | [X]US2003097120 (SANTERRE PAUL J [CA]) [X] 1,6,14,15 * paragraphs [0093] , [ 148]; claims 1, 3, 6, 12 *; | [X]WO2005110485 (INTERFACE BIOLOGICS INC [CA], et al) [X] 1,6,14,15 * page 10, lines 3-8 * * examples 7, 8 * * claim 33 *; | [A] - JIANG T ET AL, "Tumor imaging by means of proteolytic activation of cell-penetrating peptides", PROCEEDINGS OF THE NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, NATIONAL ACADEMY OF SCIENCES, (20041221), vol. 101, no. 51, doi:10.1073/PNAS.0408191101, ISSN 0027-8424, pages 17867 - 17872, XP002369426 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/pnas.0408191101 | [A] - MARCIO F. M. ALVES ET AL, "S3 to S3' subsite specificity of recombinant human cathepsin K and development of selective internally quenched fluorescent substrates", BIOCHEMICAL JOURNAL, (20030801), vol. 373, no. 3, doi:10.1042/BJ20030438, ISSN 0264-6021, pages 981 - 986, XP055132646 [A] 1-15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1042/bj20030438 | International search | [X]CA2369999 (VECTRAMED INC [US]); | [X]CA2419429 (CORNELL RES FOUNDATION INC [US]); | [X]CA2462529 (SANTERRE PAUL J [CA]); | [X]CA2506319 (POLYMERIX CORP [US]); | [X]CA2467321 (LI MEI [CA], et al); | [XE]WO2007100883 (TYCO HEALTHCARE [US], et al); | [X] - PECHAR M. ET AL, "Poly(ethylene glycol) Multiblock Copolymer as a Carrier of Anti-Cancer Drug Doxrubicin", BIOCONJUGATE CHEMISTRY, (200003), vol. 11, no. 2, pages 131 - 139, XP002961562 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bc990092l | [X] - KIM K.S. ET AL, "Controlled Release of Prodrugs Based on the Biodegradable Poly(L-glutamic acid) Microspheres", POLYMER JOURNAL, (1999), vol. 31, no. 10, pages 813 - 816, XP008145703 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1295/polymj.31.813 |