EP2254438 - HAIRSTYLING APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 07.12.2012 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 18.07.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 20.08.2014 [2014/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte, 5/11 24052 Azzano S. Paolo (BG) / IT | [2010/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MORGANDI, Arturo c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | 02 /
AGUTI, Alberto c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | 03 /
MOSCONI, Claudio c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | 04 /
WILHELM, Monica c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | [2012/04] |
Former [2010/48] | 01 /
MORGANDI, Arturo c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 I-24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | ||
02 /
AGUTI, Alberto c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 I-24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | |||
03 /
MOSCONI, Claudio c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 I-24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | |||
04 /
WILHELM, Monica c/o Tenacta Group S.p.A. Via Piemonte 5/11 I-24052 Azzano S.Paolo (Bergamo) / IT | Representative(s) | Checcacci, Giorgio Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2012/05] | Checcacci, Giorgio Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | ||
Former [2010/48] | Checcacci, Giorgio Porta, Checcacci & Associati S.p.A. Via Trebbia 20 20135 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07866821.7 | 19.12.2007 | [2010/48] | WO2007IT00889 | Filing language | IT | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2009078046 | Date: | 25.06.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/26] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2254438 | Date: | 01.12.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.06.2009 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2254438 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 25.06.2009 | Classification | IPC: | A45D1/04, A45D1/06, A45D2/00 | [2010/48] | CPC: |
A45D1/04 (EP,US);
A45D1/06 (EP,US);
A45D2/001 (EP,US);
A45D2200/202 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/48] | Title | German: | FRISIERGERÄT | [2010/48] | English: | HAIRSTYLING APPARATUS | [2010/48] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE COIFFURE | [2010/48] | Entry into regional phase | 20.07.2010 | National basic fee paid | 20.07.2010 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.07.2010 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.07.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.07.2010 | Examination requested [2010/48] | 19.08.2010 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 22.08.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.12.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 19.12.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.08.2011 | Opposition(s) | 05.11.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/02] | Request for further processing for: | 17.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 17.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 17.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2010 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 17.09.2010 | Request for further processing filed | 17.09.2010 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 04.10.2010 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 01.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 19.07.2010 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   17.09.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 19.12.2007 | AT | 01.02.2012 | BE | 01.02.2012 | CY | 01.02.2012 | CZ | 01.02.2012 | DK | 01.02.2012 | EE | 01.02.2012 | FI | 01.02.2012 | LT | 01.02.2012 | LV | 01.02.2012 | MT | 01.02.2012 | NL | 01.02.2012 | PL | 01.02.2012 | RO | 01.02.2012 | SE | 01.02.2012 | SI | 01.02.2012 | SK | 01.02.2012 | TR | 01.02.2012 | BG | 01.05.2012 | GR | 02.05.2012 | IS | 01.06.2012 | PT | 01.06.2012 | [2014/34] |
Former [2014/21] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
TR | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/51] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
MT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
BG | 01.05.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 01.02.2012 | |
BE | 01.02.2012 | ||
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
SK | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
CZ | 01.02.2012 | ||
DK | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
RO | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
SI | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/48] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
EE | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
SE | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/41] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
CY | 01.02.2012 | ||
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/39] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
LV | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | BE | 01.02.2012 | |
FI | 01.02.2012 | ||
LT | 01.02.2012 | ||
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
PL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
PT | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
GR | 02.05.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
NL | 01.02.2012 | ||
IS | 01.06.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | LT | 01.02.2012 | |
IS | 01.06.2012 | Cited in | International search | [X]US5913315 (TODD MARK D [US]) [X] 1-3,16,17,20-25,27,32* column 2, line 54 - column 3, line 17; figure -; claim - *; | [X]US2004000319 (CARBALLADA JOSE ANTONIO [US], et al) [X] 1-8,10-12,16-32 * paragraphs [0002] , [0006] , [0007] , [0063] - [0067] - [0070]; figure -; claim - *; | [X]EP1652445 (K I C A INC [KR], et al) [X] 1-3,16-32 * paragraphs [0001] , [0011] , [0018] - [0025] - [0034] , [0065] , [0066]; figure -; claim - * |