EP2067034 - EIF4E REGULON-BASED DIAGNOSTICS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.06.2019 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 06.07.2018 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.02.2018 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 12.01.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2020 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): CY | published on 05.08.2020 [2020/32] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Translational Therapeutics, Inc. 163 Scituate Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | [2009/24] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JAMIESON, Gordon A. 163 Scituate Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 02 /
BORDEN, Katherine L. B. 2275 Rue Beaudet St. Laurent Quebec H4M 1J6 / CA | 03 /
CULJKOVIC, Biljana 4870 Cote des Nieges, Apt. 110 Montreal Quebec H3V 1H3 / CA | 04 /
KENTSIS, Alex 255 Massachusetts Avenue, No. 914 Boston, MA 02115 / US | [2010/31] |
Former [2010/25] | 01 /
JAMIESON, Gordon A. 163 Scituate Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | ||
02 /
BORDEN, Katherine L. B. 2275 Rue Beaudet St. Laurent, Quebec, H4M 1J6 / CA | |||
03 /
CULJKOVIC, Biljana 4870 Cote des Nieges, Apt. 110 Montreal, Quebec, H3V 1H3 / CA | |||
04 /
KENTSIS, Alex 255 Massachusetts Avenue, No. 914 Boston, MA 02115 / US | |||
Former [2009/24] | 01 /
JAMIESON, Gordon A. 163 Scituate Street Arlington, MA 02476 / US | ||
02 /
BORDEN, Katherine L. B. 2275 Rue Beaudet St. Laurent, Quebec, H4M 1J6 / CA | Representative(s) | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2018/32] |
Former [2009/24] | Lee, Nicholas John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP 20 Red Lion Street London WC1R 4PJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07867193.0 | 01.10.2007 | [2009/24] | WO2007US21167 | Priority number, date | US20060848583P | 29.09.2006 Original published format: US 848583 P | US20060854404P | 25.10.2006 Original published format: US 854404 P | US20070942884P | 08.06.2007 Original published format: US 942884 P | [2009/24] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060369 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2067034 | Date: | 10.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/24] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2067034 | Date: | 08.08.2018 | Language: | EN | [2018/32] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 21.08.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, G01N33/574, G01N33/50 | [2010/30] | CPC: |
G01N33/57484 (EP);
G01N33/5011 (EP);
G01N2333/4703 (EP);
G01N2333/4739 (EP);
G01N2510/00 (EP);
G01N2800/32 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/24] | G01N33/53 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2018/32] |
Former [2009/24] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | AUF EIF4E-REGULON BASIERENDE DIAGNOSTIK | [2009/24] | English: | EIF4E REGULON-BASED DIAGNOSTICS | [2009/24] | French: | DIAGNOSTICS À BASE DE RÉGULON EIF4E | [2009/28] |
Former [2009/24] | DIAGNOSTICS A BASE DE REGULON EIF4E | Entry into regional phase | 30.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 30.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 30.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 30.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/24] | 06.06.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 18.11.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.06.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.12.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.06.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 13.01.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time | 22.03.2017 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.03.2018 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.07.2018 | Fee for grant paid | 02.07.2018 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 02.07.2018 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13194721.0 / EP2762886 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2011 | Opposition(s) | 09.05.2019 | No opposition filed within time limit [2019/29] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the examination report | 22.03.2017 | Request for further processing filed | 22.03.2017 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 31.03.2017 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to indicate the wish to proceed further with the application | 06.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2011 | Decision despatched | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 06.06.2011 | Request for further processing filed | 06.06.2011 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 11.08.2011 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 13.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 11.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.10.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 12.10.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 11.10.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 11.10.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 01.10.2007 | AT | 08.08.2018 | CY | 08.08.2018 | CZ | 08.08.2018 | DK | 08.08.2018 | EE | 08.08.2018 | ES | 08.08.2018 | FI | 08.08.2018 | IT | 08.08.2018 | LT | 08.08.2018 | LV | 08.08.2018 | MC | 08.08.2018 | NL | 08.08.2018 | PL | 08.08.2018 | PT | 08.08.2018 | RO | 08.08.2018 | SE | 08.08.2018 | SI | 08.08.2018 | SK | 08.08.2018 | TR | 08.08.2018 | LU | 01.10.2018 | MT | 01.10.2018 | BE | 31.10.2018 | BG | 08.11.2018 | GR | 09.11.2018 | IS | 08.12.2018 | [2020/32] |
Former [2020/30] | HU | 01.10.2007 | |
AT | 08.08.2018 | ||
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
MT | 01.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/27] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PT | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
MT | 01.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/16] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
TR | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
MT | 01.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2020/08] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
MT | 01.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/38] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
BE | 31.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/37] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SI | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/30] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
LU | 01.10.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/28] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
MC | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/26] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
DK | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/24] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
EE | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
SK | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/22] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
CZ | 08.08.2018 | ||
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
RO | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/21] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
IT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/13] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
ES | 08.08.2018 | ||
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
LV | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/10] | AT | 08.08.2018 | |
FI | 08.08.2018 | ||
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
PL | 08.08.2018 | ||
SE | 08.08.2018 | ||
BG | 08.11.2018 | ||
GR | 09.11.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/09] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
NL | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/08] | FI | 08.08.2018 | |
LT | 08.08.2018 | ||
IS | 08.12.2018 | ||
Former [2019/07] | LT | 08.08.2018 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - KENTSIS A. ET AL., "Ribavirin suppresses eIF4E-mediated oncogenic transformation by physical mimicry of the 7-methyl guanosine mRNA cap", PROC. NATL. ACAD. SCI. USA, (20041228), vol. 101, no. 52, pages 18105 - 18110, XP002587696 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1073/PNAS.0406927102 | [X] - KENTSIS A. ET AL., "Further evidence that ribavirin interacts with eIF4E", RNA, (200512), vol. 11, no. 12, pages 1762 - 1766, XP002587697 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - CULJKOVIC B. ET AL., "eIF4E promotes nuclear export of cyclin D1 mRNAs via an element in the 3 ' UTR", J. CELL BIOL., (20050425), vol. 169, no. 2, pages 245 - 256, XP002587698 [X] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/JCB.200501019 | [XP] - CULJKOVIC B. ET AL., "eIF4E is a central node of an RNA regulon that governs cellular proliferation", J. CELL BIOL., (20061106), vol. 175, no. 3, pages 415 - 426, XP002587699 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/JCB.200607020 | [T] - CULJKOVIC B. ET AL., "The eIF4E RNA regulon promotes the Akt signaling pathway", J. CELL BIOL., (20080407), vol. 181, no. 1, pages 51 - 63, XP002587700 [T] 1-15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1083/JCB.200707018 | [XP] - CULJKOVIC B. ET AL., "Controlling gene expression through RNA regulons - The role of the eukaryotic translation initiation factor eIF4E", CELL CYCLE, (20070101), vol. 6, no. 1, pages 65 - 69, XP002587701 [XP] 1-15 * the whole document * | [X] - FAIVRE S. ET AL., "Current development of mTOR inhibitors as anticancer agents.", NATURE REVIEWS - DRUG DISCOVERY, (200608), vol. 5, no. 8, pages 671 - 688, XP002587702 [X] 1-15 * abstract * * page 672, column 2 * * figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/NRD2062 | [X] - WENDEL H.-G. ET AL., "Survival signalling by Akt and eIF4E in oncogenesis and cancer therapy", NATURE, (20040318), vol. 428, pages 332 - 337, XP002996035 [X] 8-15 * abstract * * page 334, column 2 - page 335, column 1 * * figure 5 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02369 | International search | [X] - BENEDETTI ET AL., "eIF-4E expression and its role in malignancies and metastases", ONCOGENE, (2004), vol. 23, pages 3189 - 3199, XP008105358 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/sj.onc.1207545 | [Y] - HIDALGO A. ET AL., "Microarray comparative genomic hybridization detection of chromosomal imbalances in uterine cervix carcinoma", BMC CANCER, (2005), vol. 5, no. 77, pages 1 - 7, XP021004841 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1186/1471-2407-5-77 |