EP2122699 - PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATORS AND METHODS OF FABRICATING SAME [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.12.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.01.2012 [2012/01] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Adaptivenergy Llc 1000 Lucas Way, Suite B Hampton, VA 23666 / US | [2009/48] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
EDRINGTON, Alexander, C. 4707 Colonial Avenue Norfolk, VA 23508 / US | 02 /
OTT, William, F. 4305 Styler's Mill Crossing Williamsburg, VA 23188 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Colombo, Stefano Paolo Marchi & Partners S.r.l. Via Vittor Pisani, 13 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Colombo, Stefano Paolo MARCHI & PARTNERS S.r.l. Via G.B. Pirelli, 19 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 07868127.7 | 31.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007US26484 | Priority number, date | US20060882693P | 29.12.2006 Original published format: US 882693 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008082653 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2122699 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 28.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01L41/00 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
H10N30/045 (EP,US);
H10N30/073 (EP,US);
Y10T29/42 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | PIEZOELEKTRISCHE AKTOREN UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/48] | English: | PIEZOELECTRIC ACTUATORS AND METHODS OF FABRICATING SAME | [2009/48] | French: | ACTIONNEURS PIEZOELECTRIQUES ET PROCEDES DE FABRICATION ASSOCIES | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 28.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 28.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 28.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 28.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 28.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 18.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.07.2011 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2012/01] | 10.08.2011 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.06.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   23.06.2010 | 31.12.2010 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US5036241 (MICHAELIS A JOHN [US], et al); | [Y]US5356500 (SCHEINBEIM JERRY I [US], et al); | [Y]US6614144 (VAZQUEZ CARAZO ALFREDO [US]) |