27.11.2015 |
Application deemed to be withdrawn |
published on 30.12.2015 [2015/53] |
23.08.2015 |
New entry: Application deemed to be withdrawn: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
01.04.2015 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
20.03.2015 |
First examination report |
|
17.10.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
16.10.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2012 |
Change - applicant |
published on 18.07.2012 [2012/29] |
14.10.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.09.2011 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
21.01.2011 |
Supplementary search report |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
21.01.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
21.01.2011 |
Change - classification |
published on 23.02.2011 [2011/08] |
29.10.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.01.2010 |
Change - extension states |
published on 03.02.2010 [2010/05] |
02.12.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee |
|
02.12.2009 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.12.2009 |
New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.06.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
05.06.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 08.07.2009 [2009/28] |
29.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
15.05.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
05.05.2009 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
30.08.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
17.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
10.05.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|
26.03.2008 |
PCT data prior to European publication |
|