EP2100273 - METHOD FOR SCRIPTING INTER-SCENE TRANSITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 02.10.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.10.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 04.11.2015 [2015/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states EveryScape, Inc 716 Main Street, 2nd Floor Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Everyscape, Inc 716 Main Street, 2nd Floor Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OH, Byong Mok 26-R Court Street Newton, MA 02458 / US | 02 /
SCHOONMAKER, James 79 Norfolk Road Arlington, MA 02476 / US | 03 /
CHANG, Sidney 221 Herbert Street Waterloo, Ontario N2J 1V1 / CA | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | McCartney, Jonathan William Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | [2014/36] |
Former [2013/46] | Gibbs, Christopher Stephen, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2013/21] | Haseltine Lake LLP Redcliff Quay 120 Redcliff Street Bristol BS1 6HU / GB | ||
Former [2009/38] | Mohun, Stephen John Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07868697.9 | 08.11.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007US84039 | Priority number, date | US20060858511P | 13.11.2006 Original published format: US 858511 P | [2009/38] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008060933 | Date: | 22.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/21] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2100273 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 22.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 26.03.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G06T15/70 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
G06T13/20 (EP,US);
G06T13/40 (EP,US);
G06T13/80 (EP,US);
G06T15/04 (US);
G06T15/205 (US);
G06T19/006 (US);
G06T19/20 (US);
A63F13/50 (US);
A63F13/52 (US);
G06T13/00 (EP,US);
G06T2200/04 (US);
G06T2215/16 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | SCRIPTVERFAHREN FÜR ÜBERGÄNGE ZWISCHEN SZENEN | [2009/38] | English: | METHOD FOR SCRIPTING INTER-SCENE TRANSITIONS | [2009/38] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ÉTABLISSEMENT DE SCRIPT DES TRANSITIONS ENTRE DES SCÈNES | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 13.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 12.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 09.03.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 02.04.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.06.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/45] | 25.06.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/45] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.03.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.11.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]US2004017404 (SCHILERU-KEY RODICA [US]) [X] 1-18 * abstract * * page 4, paragraph 52 - page 6, paragraph 72 *; | [XD]US2006132482 (OH BYONG M [US]) [XD] 1-18 * page 3, paragraph 65 * * page 4, paragraph 70 - page 5, paragraph 72 * * page 8, paragraph 102 - page 9, paragraph 104 * * page 10, paragraph 120 * * page 11, paragraph 126 * * page 12, paragraph 132 - paragraph 135 *; | [A]US2004183826 (TAYLOR JAIME R [US], et al); | [A]US2003028848 (CHOI GERALD [CA]) | [A] - UYTTENDAELE M., ET AL., "High-quality Image-based Interactive Exploration of Real-World Environment", MICROSOFT TECHNICAL REPORT MSR-TR-2003-61, Redmond WA 98052, (2003), XP002511672 | Examination | - SNAVELY N ET AL, "Photo Tourism: Exploring Photo Collections in 3D", SIGGRAPH CONFERENCE PROCEEDINGS, XX, XX, (20060703), vol. 25, no. 3, pages 835 - 846, XP007906480 | by applicant | - MARK SEGAL ET AL., "Fast shadows and lighting effects using texture mapping", PROCEEDINGS OFSIGGRAPH, vol. 92, pages 249 - 252 | - THADDEUS BEIER; SHAWN NEELY, "Feature-based Image Metamorphosis", PROCEEDINGS OFSIGGRAPH, (1992), pages 35 - 42 | US20060858511 | US19590002711 | US20050712356 | US20040627335 | US20000007805 |