EP2097603 - ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR FOR MANEUVERING AN OPENING AND CLOSING ASSEMBLY INCLUDING SUCH ACTUATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.05.2017 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): MT | published on 24.10.2018 [2018/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Somfy SAS 50, Avenue du Nouveau Monde 74300 Cluses / FR | [2009/37] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MINGARDI, Marco Via Flemming 28 40050 Calderino Di Monte San Pietro / IT | 02 /
LAGARDE, Eric 119 Impasse de la Route du Battoir 74700 Sallanches / FR | [2009/37] | Representative(s) | Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2016/27] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | ||
Former [2009/37] | Myon, Gérard Jean-Pierre, et al Cabinet Lavoix Lyon 62, rue de Bonnel 69448 Lyon Cedex 03 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07870363.4 | 30.11.2007 | [2009/37] | WO2007FR01968 | Priority number, date | FR20060010524 | 01.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0610524 | [2009/37] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008071887 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/25] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2097603 | Date: | 09.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/37] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2097603 | Date: | 06.07.2016 | Language: | FR | [2016/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | E05F15/619, // E05F11/06 | [2016/07] | CPC: |
E05F11/06 (EP,US);
E05F15/619 (EP,US);
E05Y2900/148 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/37] | E05F11/06, E05F15/12 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/27] |
Former [2009/37] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER ANTRIEB ZUM BETÄTIGEN EINES FLÜGELS UND SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN ANTRIEB | [2016/07] | English: | ELECTROMECHANICAL ACTUATOR FOR MANEUVERING AN OPENING AND CLOSING ASSEMBLY INCLUDING SUCH ACTUATOR | [2009/37] | French: | ACTIONNEUR ELECTROMECANIQUE POUR LA MANOEUVRE D'UN OUVRANT ET INSTALLATION DE FERMETURE COMPRENANT UN TEL ACTIONNEUR | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/37] | ELEKTROMECHANISCHER AKTUATOR ZUM MANÖVRIEREN EINER ÖFFNUNG SOWIE SCHLIESSVORRICHTUNG MIT EINEM SOLCHEN AKTUATOR | Entry into regional phase | 11.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 11.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/37] | 04.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 24.05.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 24.05.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 24.05.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 04.02.2016 | Opposition(s) | 07.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/24] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.11.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.11.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.11.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 27.11.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.11.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.11.2007 | AT | 06.07.2016 | CY | 06.07.2016 | CZ | 06.07.2016 | DK | 06.07.2016 | EE | 06.07.2016 | ES | 06.07.2016 | FI | 06.07.2016 | LT | 06.07.2016 | LV | 06.07.2016 | MC | 06.07.2016 | MT | 06.07.2016 | NL | 06.07.2016 | PL | 06.07.2016 | RO | 06.07.2016 | SE | 06.07.2016 | SI | 06.07.2016 | SK | 06.07.2016 | TR | 06.07.2016 | BG | 06.10.2016 | GR | 07.10.2016 | IS | 06.11.2016 | PT | 07.11.2016 | BE | 30.11.2016 | CH | 30.11.2016 | GB | 30.11.2016 | IE | 30.11.2016 | LI | 30.11.2016 | LU | 30.11.2016 | [2018/43] |
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.11.2007 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
TR | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.11.2007 | |
AT | 06.07.2016 | ||
CY | 06.07.2016 | ||
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
MC | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/51] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
GB | 30.11.2016 | ||
IE | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/43] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
LU | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SI | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/35] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
CH | 30.11.2016 | ||
LI | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/31] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
CZ | 06.07.2016 | ||
DK | 06.07.2016 | ||
EE | 06.07.2016 | ||
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
RO | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
SK | 06.07.2016 | ||
BG | 06.10.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/13] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
LV | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/11] | AT | 06.07.2016 | |
ES | 06.07.2016 | ||
FI | 06.07.2016 | ||
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
GR | 07.10.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
PT | 07.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
PL | 06.07.2016 | ||
SE | 06.07.2016 | ||
IS | 06.11.2016 | ||
BE | 30.11.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | FI | 06.07.2016 | |
LT | 06.07.2016 | ||
NL | 06.07.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | LT | 06.07.2016 | Cited in | International search | [DA]EP0777028 (RASMUSSEN KANN IND AS [DK]) [DA] 1-10 * abstract * * column 3, line 32 - column 5, line 6 * * figures 1-6 *; | [A]EP1353031 (VKR HOLDING AS [DK]) [A] 1 * figures 4,5 * * paragraph [0047] * |