EP2018582 - CROSSOVER-FREE FIBER OPTIC COIL SENSOR AND WINDING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 31.12.2010 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.12.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 02.02.2011 [2011/05] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Morgan Research Corporation 4811-A Bradford Drive Huntsville, AL 35805-1948 / US | [2009/05] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WILLIAMS, Marty R. 2134 Edinburgh Drive Hunstville, AL 35803 / US | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Cordina, Kevin John, et al CMS Cameron McKenna Nabarro Olswang LLP Cannon Place 78 Cannon Street London EC4N 6AF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | Cordina, Kevin John, et al Olswang 90 High Holborn London WC1V 6XX / GB | Application number, filing date | 07870662.9 | 30.04.2007 | [2009/05] | WO2007US10498 | Priority number, date | US20070741089 | 27.04.2007 Original published format: US 741089 | US20060796014P | 28.04.2006 Original published format: US 796014 P | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008063214 | Date: | 29.05.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/22] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2018582 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 29.05.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/05] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 12.09.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G02B6/00, G01C19/72, B65H75/02, B31F1/00 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B65H54/10 (EP,US);
B65H55/04 (EP,US);
G02B6/4458 (EP,US);
B65H2701/32 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | CROSSOVER-FREIER LICHTWELLENSPULENSENSOR UND WICKELVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2009/05] | English: | CROSSOVER-FREE FIBER OPTIC COIL SENSOR AND WINDING METHOD | [2009/05] | French: | DÉTECTEUR À BOBINE DE FIBRE OPTIQUE SANS CROISEMENT ET PROCÉDÉ D'ENROULEMENT | [2009/05] | Entry into regional phase | 24.11.2008 | National basic fee paid | 24.11.2008 | Search fee paid | 24.11.2008 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.11.2008 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2008 | Request for preliminary examination filed International Preliminary Examining Authority: US | 24.11.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 09.01.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.12.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/05] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.04.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 13.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.04.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   13.10.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US5781301 (RUFFIN PAUL B [US]) [X] 3-10,13,14,16-18 * the whole document * [A] 1,2,11,12,15; | [A]US2002015154 (GOLDNER ERIC LEE [US], et al) [A] 1-18 * the whole document *; | [A]US2003053067 (HASHIMOTO YASUHARU [JP]) [A] 1-18 * the whole document * | International search | [X]US5781301 (RUFFIN PAUL B [US]); | [A]US2008130010 (WILLIAMS MARTY R [US]); | [A]US5052632 (STOKES JR LELAND L [US]) |