EP2061480 - GLMS RIBOSWITCHES, STRUCTURE-BASED COMPOUND DESIGN WITH GLMS RIBOSWITCHES, AND METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE OF AND WITH GLMS RIBOSWITCHES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.09.2014 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 22.10.2014 [2014/43] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06510 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/22] | For all designated states Yale University Two Whitney Avenue New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BREAKER, Ronald R. 131 Sugar Loaf Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | 02 /
LIM, Jinsoo 650 Mix Avenue, Apt. 2d Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 03 /
STROBEL, Scott A. 1180 Main Street Hamden, CT 06514 / US | 04 /
COCHRANE, Jesse C. 11 Cedar Street Somerville, MA 02143 / US | [2009/37] |
Former [2009/22] | 01 /
BREAKER, Ronald R. 131 Sugar Loaf Road Guilford, CT 06437 / US | ||
02 /
LIM, Jinsoo 650 Mix Avenue, Apt. 2d Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
03 /
STROBEL, Scott A. 1180 Main Street Hamden, CT 06514 / US | |||
04 /
COCHRANE, Jesse C. 565 Orange Street, 3 New Haven, CT 06511 / US | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2009/22] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele, et al Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Straße 20 81543 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07870758.5 | 06.09.2007 | [2009/22] | WO2007US19456 | Priority number, date | US20060842870P | 06.09.2006 Original published format: US 842870 P | US20060844844P | 16.09.2006 Original published format: US 844844 P | [2009/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008076156 | Date: | 26.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/26] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2061480 | Date: | 27.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 26.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 16.04.2009 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.06.2011 | Classification | IPC: | C12Q1/68, C12N15/09, A61K31/70 | [2009/23] | CPC: |
A61K31/7008 (EP,KR,US);
A61P31/04 (EP);
C07F9/6552 (EP,KR,US);
C07H11/00 (EP,KR,US);
C12Q1/6897 (KR);
G16C20/50 (EP,KR,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/22] | A61K31/7008 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/22] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | GLMS-RIBOSWITCHES, STRUKTURBASIERENDES VERBINDUNGSDESIGN MIT GLMS-RIBOSWITCHES UND VERFAHREN UND ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN ZUR VERWENDUNG VON UND MIT GLMS-RIBOSWITCHES | [2009/22] | English: | GLMS RIBOSWITCHES, STRUCTURE-BASED COMPOUND DESIGN WITH GLMS RIBOSWITCHES, AND METHODS AND COMPOSITIONS FOR USE OF AND WITH GLMS RIBOSWITCHES | [2009/22] | French: | RIBOZYMES-COMMUTATEURS GLMS, CONCEPTION À BASE STRUCTURELLE DE COMPOSÉS À RIBOZYMES-COMMUTATEURS GLMS ET PROCÉDÉS ET COMPOSITIONS UTILISANT DES RIBOZYMES-COMMUTATEURS GLMS OU AVEC DES RIBOZYMES-COMMUTATEURS GLMS | [2009/22] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 16.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 05.01.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 20.02.2014 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 01.04.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2014/43] | 21.05.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2014/43] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 20.02.2014 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 26.09.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.09.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2013 | 07   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]WO2007100412 (UNIV YALE [US], et al) [E] 1-12 * page 3, lines 5-8 * * page 34, lines 10-12 * * page 44, lines 15-25 * * figure 8 * * page 48, lines 29-34 *; | [X] - BLOUNT K ET AL, "DEVELOPMENT AND APPLICATION OF A HIGH-THROUGHPUT ASSAY FOR GLMS RIBOSWITCH ACTIVATORS", RNA BIOLOGY, LANDES BIOSCIENCE, US, (20060101), vol. 3, no. 2, ISSN 1547-6286, pages 77 - 81, XP008072343 [X] 1-12 * figures 3, 8, * * page 77, paragraphs 1-3 * | [XP] - LIM JINSOO ET AL, "Characteristics of ligand recognition by a glmS self-cleaving ribozyme", ANGEWANDTE CHEMIE. INTERNATIONAL EDITION, WILEY VCH VERLAG, WEINHEIM, (20061013), vol. 45, no. 40, doi:10.1002/ANIE.200602534, ISSN 1433-7851, pages 6689 - 6693, XP002455616 [XP] 1-12 * abstract * * figure 2 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/anie.200602534 | International search | [A] - WINKLER ET AL., "Control of gene expression by a natural metabolite-responsive ribozyme", NATURE, (200403), vol. 428, pages 281 - 286, XP002410184 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/nature02362 | [A] - VIRESCHAK ET AL., "Riboswitches: the oldest mechanism for the resultation of gene expression?", TRENDS IN GENETICS, (200401), vol. 20, no. 1, pages 44 - 50, XP004481965 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.tig.2003.11.008 | [AP] - KLEIN ET AL., "Structural Basis of blmS Ribozyme Activation by Glucosamine-6-Phosphate", SCIENCE, (20060922), vol. 313, pages 1752 - 1756, XP008107972 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1126/science.1129666 |