EP2069673 - NANOLITER FLOW RATE SEPARATION AND ELECTROSPRAY DEVICE WITH PLUG AND PLAY HIGH PRESSURE CONNECTIONS AND MULTI-SENSOR DIAGNOSTIC MONITORING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.08.2014 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Van Pelt, Colleen K. CorSolutions 622 Scofield Rd. Groton, NY 13073 / US | [2013/40] |
Former [2009/25] | For all designated states Van Pelt, Colleen K. CorSolutions 622 Scofield Rd. Groton, NY 13073 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2009/25] | Representative(s) | Adamson Jones Park View House 58 The Ropewalk Nottingham NG1 5DW / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2013/40] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2011/15] | Adamson Jones BioCity Nottingham Pennyfoot Street Nottingham Nottinghamshire NG1 1GF / GB | ||
Former [2009/25] | Fleuchaus, Michael A., et al Fleuchaus & Gallo Partnerschaft Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Sollner Strasse 36 81479 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 07871021.7 | 13.08.2007 | [2009/25] | WO2007US75817 | Priority number, date | US20060822231P | 12.08.2006 Original published format: US 822231 P | [2009/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008073535 | Date: | 19.06.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/25] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2069673 | Date: | 17.06.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 19.06.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/25] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2069673 | Date: | 02.10.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 13.11.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2010 | Classification | IPC: | F16L25/00, B01D15/08, B01D21/30, G01N30/72, B01L3/00, // G01N30/60 | [2012/49] | CPC: |
B01L3/565 (EP,US);
F16L19/065 (US);
G01N30/7266 (EP,US);
B01L2300/0838 (EP,US);
Y10S285/92 (EP,US);
Y10T137/6851 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2010/33] | F16L25/00, B01D15/08, B01D21/30, // G01N30/60 | ||
Former IPC [2009/25] | F16L25/00, B01D15/08, B01D21/30 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/25] | Title | German: | NANOLITER-FLUSSRATEN-TRENNUNGS- UND ELEKTROSPRAY-VORRICHTUNG MIT PLUG-AND-PLAY-HOCHDRUCKANSCHLÜSSEN SOWIE DIAGNOSEÜBERWACHUNGSSYSTEM MIT MEHREREN SENSOREN | [2009/25] | English: | NANOLITER FLOW RATE SEPARATION AND ELECTROSPRAY DEVICE WITH PLUG AND PLAY HIGH PRESSURE CONNECTIONS AND MULTI-SENSOR DIAGNOSTIC MONITORING SYSTEM | [2009/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE SÉPARATION DE DÉBIT DE L'ORDRE DU NANOLITRE ET D'ÉLECTRONÉBULISATION À RACCORDS PRÊTS À BRANCHER ET SYSTÈME MULTI-DÉTECTEUR DE SURVEILLANCE ET DE DIAGNOSTIC | [2009/25] | Entry into regional phase | 12.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 12.03.2009 | Search fee paid | 13.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 13.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/26] | 01.02.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 26.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 04.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.06.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.10.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.03.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.07.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 22.07.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 26.04.2011 | Opposition(s) | 03.07.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/37] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 25.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 10.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 23.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2011 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   10.02.2012 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2007 | AT | 02.10.2013 | BE | 02.10.2013 | BG | 02.10.2013 | CY | 02.10.2013 | CZ | 02.10.2013 | EE | 02.10.2013 | ES | 02.10.2013 | FI | 02.10.2013 | LT | 02.10.2013 | LV | 02.10.2013 | MC | 02.10.2013 | MT | 02.10.2013 | PL | 02.10.2013 | RO | 02.10.2013 | SI | 02.10.2013 | SK | 02.10.2013 | TR | 02.10.2013 | GR | 03.01.2014 | IS | 02.02.2014 | PT | 03.02.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 13.08.2007 | |
AT | 02.10.2013 | ||
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
MT | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
GR | 03.01.2014 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
BG | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
MC | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/37] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
RO | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
SK | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/36] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
EE | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/28] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
PT | 03.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/26] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CY | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/25] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
LV | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/24] | AT | 02.10.2013 | |
BE | 02.10.2013 | ||
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
ES | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
PL | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/23] | BE | 02.10.2013 | |
CZ | 02.10.2013 | ||
FI | 02.10.2013 | ||
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
IS | 02.02.2014 | ||
Former [2014/22] | FI | 02.10.2013 | |
LT | 02.10.2013 | ||
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/20] | LT | 02.10.2013 | |
SI | 02.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/12] | SI | 02.10.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US5090871 (STORY CARL E [US], et al) [A] 7-13* column 3, lines 20-30; figure 1 *; | [XI]US5169120 (GUTHRIE JR JAMES W [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * section: Deatailed description of the invention;; figure 1 * [I] 14,15; | [X]WO2005119110 (NEW OBJECTIVE INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6 * page 4, lines 27-35; figure 2 *; | [XI]US7014222 (POPPE CARL H [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 4, line 19 - page 5, line 22; figure 2 * [I] 14,15; | [XI]WO2006083597 (VALCO INSTR CO INC [US]) [X] 1-6 * page 1, paragraph 5 - page 2, paragraph 2 * [I] 14,15 | International search | [A]USRE31974E ; | [A]US4991883 (WORDEN RAYMOND D [US]); | [A]US5911954 (FORD DOUGLAS W [US]) |