EP2120232 - A RANDOM VOICE PRINT CIPHER CERTIFICATION SYSTEM, RANDOM VOICE PRINT CIPHER LOCK AND GENERATING METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 07.01.2011 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.01.2011 | Withdrawal of application | published on 09.02.2011 [2011/06] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Top Digital Co., Ltd. 3F-6, No. 79, Hsintai 5th Road Sec, 1 Hsichih City Taipei Hsien Taiwan / CN | [2009/47] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Kun-Lang 9f No.22-5, Le-Li 3rd St. An-Le District Keelung Taiwan / CN | 02 /
OUYANG, Yen-Chieh 16f-3 No.187, Hsing Chin Rd. TNorth District Taichung Taiwan / CN | [2009/47] | Representative(s) | Schwerbrock, Florian Hagenauer Strasse 1 10435 Berlin / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/47] | Schwerbrock, Florian Danziger Strasse 35a 20099 Hamburg / DE | Application number, filing date | 07871767.5 | 06.12.2007 | [2009/47] | WO2007CN71200 | Priority number, date | CN20061161138 | 07.12.2006 Original published format: CN200610161138 | [2009/47] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2008083571 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | ZH | [2008/29] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2120232 | Date: | 18.11.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/47] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 17.07.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.12.2010 | Classification | IPC: | G10L17/00, H04L9/32, G06F21/00, G07F7/10 | [2009/47] | CPC: |
H04K1/00 (EP,US);
G06F21/32 (EP,US);
G10L17/00 (EP,US);
G10L17/02 (EP,US);
G10L17/06 (EP,US);
H04L9/0662 (EP,US);
H04L9/3231 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/47] | Title | German: | ZUFALLS-VOICE-PRINT-CIPHER-ZERTIFIZIERUNGSSYSTEM, ZUFALLS-VOICE-PRINT-CIPHER-SPERRE UND VERFAHREN ZU DEREN HERSTELLUNG | [2009/47] | English: | A RANDOM VOICE PRINT CIPHER CERTIFICATION SYSTEM, RANDOM VOICE PRINT CIPHER LOCK AND GENERATING METHOD THEREOF | [2009/47] | French: | SYSTÈME DE CERTIFICATION DE CRYPTAGE ALÉATOIRE D'EMPREINTE VOCALE, VERROU DE CRYPTAGE ALÉATOIRE D'EMPREINTE VOCALE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE CRÉATION ASSOCIÉ À CEUX-CI | [2009/47] | Entry into regional phase | 29.06.2009 | Translation filed | 27.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.07.2009 | Examination requested [2010/16] | 11.08.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: filing fee / search fee not paid in time | 05.01.2011 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2011/06] | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the search fee | 02.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the filing fee | 02.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of the examination fee | 02.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to non-payment of designation fees TR, SK, SI, SE, RO, PT, PL, NL, MT, MC, LV, LU, LT, IT, IS, IE, HU, GR, GB, FR, FI, ES, EE, DK, DE, CZ, CY, CH, BG, BE, AT | 02.09.2009 | Request for further processing filed | 02.09.2009 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.09.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US5216720 (NAIK JAYANT M [US], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 4, lines 11-21 * * column 4, lines 23-38 *; | [Y]WO9919865 (BRITISH TELECOMM [GB], et al) [Y] 1-8 * abstract ** page 5, lines 17-32 *; | [Y]EP1526505 (ARUZE CORP [JP]) [Y] 1-8 * abstract * * column 2, lines 39-57 * | International search | [X]US5995927 (LI QI P [US]); | [A]US2002104027 (SKERPAC VALENE [US]); | [X]CN1610294 (ARUZE CORP [JP]); | [A]CN1808567 (TAN WENHUA [CN]) | by applicant | TW490655B |