EP2108061 - CRYSTAL GROWTH IN A SOLUTION IN STATIONARY CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 10.07.2020 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.07.2020 | Refusal of application | published on 12.08.2020 [2020/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE -CNRS- 3, rue Michel-Ange 75016 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | For all designated states CENTRE NATIONAL DE LA RECHERCHE SCIENTIFIQUE (CNRS) 3, rue Michel Ange 75016 Paris / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
IBANEZ, Alain 56 rue de la Croix Rousse 38500 Voiron / FR | 02 /
ZACCARO, Julien Lot. Le Noyer Vert Rue de la Martellière 38500 Voiron / FR | [2009/42] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf Technologies Bâtiment O2 2, rue Sarah Bernhardt CS90017 92665 Asnières-sur-Seine Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/42] | Jacobson, Claude Cabinet Lavoix 2, place d'Estienne d'Orves 75441 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07871782.4 | 03.12.2007 | [2009/42] | WO2007FR01980 | Priority number, date | FR20060055343 | 06.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0655343 | [2009/42] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008081103 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2108061 | Date: | 14.10.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/42] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C30B7/00, C30B29/14, C30B7/08, C30B35/00 | [2009/42] | CPC: |
C30B7/08 (EP,US);
C30B29/14 (EP,US);
C30B35/00 (EP,US);
Y10T117/1024 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/42] | Title | German: | ZIEHEN VON KRISTALLEN IN EINER LÖSUNG UNTER STATIONÄREN BEDINGUNGEN | [2009/42] | English: | CRYSTAL GROWTH IN A SOLUTION IN STATIONARY CONDITIONS | [2009/42] | French: | CROISSANCE CRISTALLINE EN SOLUTION DANS DES CONDITIONS STATIONNAIRES. | [2009/42] | Entry into regional phase | 05.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 05.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/42] | 06.04.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 29.06.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 19.03.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 03.09.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.09.2013 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 19.02.2014 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.02.2020 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2020/33] | 11.02.2020 | Date of oral proceedings | 27.02.2020 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 28.02.2020 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2020/33] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.04.2011 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.12.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 22.12.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 23.12.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 22.12.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 29.11.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 29.11.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.12.2019 | 13   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]GB482096 (TELEFUNKEN GMBH) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,10,11,14,16 * page 2, column 1, line 2 - column 2, line 95; figure 1; claims 1-11 *; | [XY]GB676212 (STANDARD TELEPHONES CABLES LTD) [X] 1,3,5,7,8,10,11,14,16 * page 3, column 1, line 12 - column 2, line 84; figure 1; claims 1-12 * [Y] 2,4,6,9,15; | [XY] - FUJIOKA K ET AL, "Basic technology of fast growing for normal and partially deuterated KDP crystals", PROCEEDINGS OF THE SPIE - THE INTERNATIONAL SOCIETY FOR OPTICAL ENGINEERING SPIE-INT. SOC. OPT. ENG USA, (1995), vol. 2633, ISSN 0277-786X, pages 292 - 298, XP002446694 [X] 12,13 * paragraph [02.2] - paragraph [03.3]; figures 1-4 * [Y] 2,4,6,9,15 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1117/12.228324 | [A] - RAVI G ET AL, "Effect of temperature and deuterium concentration on the growth of deuterated potassium dihydrogen phosphate (DKDP) single crystals", JOURNAL OF CRYSTAL GROWTH, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (19991215), vol. 207, no. 4, ISSN 0022-0248, pages 319 - 324, XP004363821 [A] 1-16 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0022-0248(99)00384-X | Examination | US2459869 | JPS623090 | - Leigh Hagenson Thompson ET AL, "The rate enhancing e!ect of ultrasound by inducing supersaturation in a solid}liquid system", Chemical Engineering Science, (20000101), pages 3085 - 3090, URL: https://www.sciencedirect.com/science/article/pii/S0009250999004819/pdfft?md5=7c1ae4777f0ad112e7b327c8d516aead&pid=1-s2.0-S0009250999004819-main.pdf, XP055609155 |