EP2099278 - TOOL CARRIER FOR COMBINING AGRICULTURAL APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 19.08.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.10.2019 | Change - lapse in a contracting state | published on 13.11.2019 [2019/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Société des Etablissements Louis Quivogne 70210 Polaincourt / FR | [2010/41] |
Former [2009/38] | For all designated states Societe Des Etablissements Louis Quivogne 70210 Polaincourt / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUIVOGNE, Jean-Luc 48, rue Tuilerie F-70500 Jussey / FR | [2009/38] | Representative(s) | Beauvais, Emmanuelle, et al Ipside 16, rue de la Paix 75002 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/38] | Beauvais, Emmanuelle, et al Cabinet Schmit-Chrétien SNC 16, rue de la Paix F-75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07871794.9 | 05.12.2007 | [2009/38] | WO2007FR01998 | Priority number, date | FR20060010734 | 08.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0610734 | [2009/38] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008081112 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2099278 | Date: | 16.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/38] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2099278 | Date: | 13.10.2010 | Language: | FR | [2010/41] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | A01B51/04, A01B73/06 | [2009/38] | CPC: |
A01B51/04 (EP);
A01B73/065 (EP);
A01C7/208 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/38] | Title | German: | WERKZEUGTRÄGER FÜR EINE LANDWIRTSCHAFTLICHE ERNTEMASCHINE | [2009/38] | English: | TOOL CARRIER FOR COMBINING AGRICULTURAL APPARATUS | [2009/38] | French: | PORTE-OUTILS DESTINÉ À COMBINER DES APPAREILS AGRICOLES | [2009/38] | Entry into regional phase | 14.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 14.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 08.06.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.08.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 20.08.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 14.07.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 13.10.2010 | CY | 13.10.2010 | CZ | 13.10.2010 | DK | 13.10.2010 | EE | 13.10.2010 | FI | 13.10.2010 | IE | 13.10.2010 | LT | 13.10.2010 | LV | 13.10.2010 | MT | 13.10.2010 | NL | 13.10.2010 | PL | 13.10.2010 | SE | 13.10.2010 | SI | 13.10.2010 | SK | 13.10.2010 | TR | 13.10.2010 | LU | 05.12.2010 | BE | 31.12.2010 | MC | 31.12.2010 | BG | 13.01.2011 | GR | 14.01.2011 | ES | 24.01.2011 | IS | 13.02.2011 | PT | 14.02.2011 | HU | 14.04.2011 | [2019/46] |
Former [2017/51] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LU | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/33] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LU | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
LU | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
TR | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
LU | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/44] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
LU | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/42] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
HU | 14.04.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CY | 13.10.2010 | ||
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/06] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
MT | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2012/03] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
IT | 05.12.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/51] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
DE | 01.07.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
FR | 03.01.2011 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/45] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
BE | 31.12.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
DK | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
PL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
SK | 13.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/35] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
CZ | 13.10.2010 | ||
EE | 13.10.2010 | ||
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/34] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
IE | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
MC | 31.12.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
ES | 24.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | ||
Former [2011/29] | AT | 13.10.2010 | |
FI | 13.10.2010 | ||
LT | 13.10.2010 | ||
LV | 13.10.2010 | ||
NL | 13.10.2010 | ||
SE | 13.10.2010 | ||
SI | 13.10.2010 | ||
BG | 13.01.2011 | ||
GR | 14.01.2011 | ||
IS | 13.02.2011 | ||
PT | 14.02.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]EP0135180 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * pages 6-10; figures 1,2 *; | [A]WO9852402 (FLEXI COIL LTD [CA], et al) [A] 4* figures M,N *; | [A]EP1205098 (DEERE & CO [US]) [A] 1-9 * columns 1-5; figures 1-3 *; | [A]US2002074139 (ANKENMAN THOMAS W [US]) [A] 4 * figure 3 *; | [DA]FR2871988 (QUIVOGNE SAS SOC PAR ACTIONS S [FR]) [DA] 7 * pages 3-4; figures 1-15 * |