EP2102071 - REFILLING PROHIBITING DEVICE FOR THE NECK OF A VESSEL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/39] | FILLING PROHIBITING DEVICE FOR THE NECK OF A VESSEL, TYPICALLY A BOTTLE, AND COMPOSITE PLUGGING CAP INCLUDING SAID DEVICE | ||
[2013/08] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 11.04.2014 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.09.2014 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LV | published on 08.10.2014 [2014/41] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amcor Flexibles Capsules France 17, Place des Reflets La Defense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR | [2013/21] |
Former [2009/39] | For all designated states Alcan Packaging Capsules 17 Place des Reflets La Défense 2 92400 Courbevoie / FR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GRANGER, Jacques 20, rue Constantine F-33350 Sainte Terre / FR | 02 /
BOURREAU, Jean-Marie 1, rue de la Virade F-24700 Le Pizou / FR | [2009/39] | Representative(s) | Gernet, Samuel Andreas, et al Gernet Althaus IP AG Querstrasse 5 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | [N/P] |
Former [2013/31] | Gernet, Samuel Andreas, et al Suisse Technology Partners AG Badische Bahnhofstrasse 16 8212 Neuhausen am Rheinfall / CH | ||
Former [2009/44] | Fénot, Dominique, et al Alcan Centre de Recherches de Voreppe 725, rue Aristide Berges- BP 27 38341 Voreppe / FR | ||
Former [2009/39] | Fénot, Dominique Alcan France S.A.S. Propriété Industrielle 217, cours Lafayette 69451 Lyon Cedex 06 / FR | Application number, filing date | 07871800.4 | 06.12.2007 | [2009/39] | WO2007FR02004 | Priority number, date | FR20060010886 | 13.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0610886 | [2009/39] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008084143 | Date: | 17.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/29] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2102071 | Date: | 23.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 17.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/39] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2102071 | Date: | 05.06.2013 | Language: | FR | [2013/23] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 12.09.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/02, B65D49/00 | [2009/39] | CPC: |
B65D49/02 (EP,US);
B65D49/00 (EP,US);
B65D49/12 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/39] | Title | German: | NACHFÜLLUNGSVERHINDERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN HALS EINES GEFÄSSES | [2013/08] | English: | REFILLING PROHIBITING DEVICE FOR THE NECK OF A VESSEL | [2013/08] | French: | DISPOSITIF D'IRREMPLISSABILITE POUR GOULOT DE RECIPIENT | [2013/08] |
Former [2009/39] | FÜLLUNGSVERHINDERUNGSVORRICHTUNG FÜR DEN HALS EINES GEFÄSSES, INSBESONDERE EINER FLASCHE, UND VERBUNDVERSCHLUSSKAPPE MIT DIESER VORRICHTUNG | ||
Former [2009/39] | FILLING PROHIBITING DEVICE FOR THE NECK OF A VESSEL, TYPICALLY A BOTTLE, AND COMPOSITE PLUGGING CAP INCLUDING SAID DEVICE | ||
Former [2009/39] | DISPOSITIF D'IRREMPLISSABILITE POUR GOULOT DE RÉCIPIENT, TYPIQUEMENT UNE BOUTEILLE, ET CAPSULE DE BOUCHAGE COMPOSITE COMPRENANT LEDIT DISPOSITIF | Entry into regional phase | 04.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.06.2009 | Examination requested [2009/39] | 29.01.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 29.01.2013 | Opposition(s) | 06.03.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.12.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 26.12.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | LT | 05.06.2013 | RO | 05.06.2013 | SI | 05.06.2013 | IS | 05.10.2013 | LV | 06.12.2013 | [2014/41] |
Former [2014/37] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
RO | 05.06.2013 | ||
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
SI | 05.06.2013 | ||
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/10] | LT | 05.06.2013 | |
IS | 05.10.2013 | ||
Former [2014/08] | LT | 05.06.2013 | Cited in | International search | [A]FR1055727 (M. RIFFET) [A] 1 * page 2, column 1, line 27 - column 2, line 12; figure - *; | [A]EP0022731 (FISCHER MARC [FR]; VERON GHISLAINE EPOUSE FISCHER [FR]; RIFFET MARCEL) [A] 1 * page 2, line 22 - page 4, line 15; figure - *; | [A]GB2416765 (AITKEN LEON [GB], et al) [A] 1 * page 15, line 14 - line 18; figure 5 *; | [A]WO2006051335 (ROBERTSON MICHAEL [GB]) [A] 1 * figure -; claim - *; | [A]EP1681244 (INGRAM ROY ALBERT [GB]) [A] 1* column 4, line 44 - column 7, line 33; figure - * |