EP2104621 - MOTOR VEHICLE LIGHTING UNIT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 12.10.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Compagnie Plastic Omnium 19 Avenue Jules Carteret 69007 Lyon / FR | [2009/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FAYT, Arnold 3 Route de la Combe F-01640 Jujurieux / FR | 02 /
CHERON, Hugues 13 Chemin du Calvaire F-01800 Meximieux / FR | 03 /
ROCHEBLAVE, Laurent 146 Avenue Roger Salengro F-69100 Villeurbanne / FR | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al LLR 11 boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Remy, Vincent Noel Paul, et al Lhermet La Bigne & Remy 11, boulevard de Sébastopol 75001 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 07872015.8 | 21.12.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007FR52605 | Priority number, date | FR20060011331 | 22.12.2006 Original published format: FR 0611331 | [2009/40] | Filing language | FR | Procedural language | FR | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008087347 | Date: | 24.07.2008 | Language: | FR | [2008/30] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2104621 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | FR | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 24.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2104621 | Date: | 07.12.2011 | Language: | FR | [2011/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 16.10.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60Q1/04 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
B60Q1/0491 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | BELEUCHTUNGSEINHEIT FÜR EIN KRAFTFAHRZEUG | [2009/40] | English: | MOTOR VEHICLE LIGHTING UNIT | [2009/40] | French: | BLOC OPTIQUE DE VEHICULE AUTOMOBILE | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 13.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 13.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 13.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 19.06.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/40] | 22.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.06.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.10.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 26.10.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 22.02.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.09.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/46] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 07.12.2011 | CY | 07.12.2011 | DK | 07.12.2011 | EE | 07.12.2011 | FI | 07.12.2011 | HU | 07.12.2011 | IE | 07.12.2011 | IT | 07.12.2011 | LT | 07.12.2011 | LV | 07.12.2011 | MT | 07.12.2011 | NL | 07.12.2011 | PL | 07.12.2011 | RO | 07.12.2011 | SE | 07.12.2011 | SI | 07.12.2011 | SK | 07.12.2011 | TR | 07.12.2011 | LU | 21.12.2011 | CH | 31.12.2011 | LI | 31.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 07.03.2012 | GR | 08.03.2012 | IS | 07.04.2012 | PT | 09.04.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
TR | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
FI | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
LU | 21.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
MT | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2013/07] | AT | 07.12.2011 | |
CY | 07.12.2011 | ||
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/50] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/49] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
DK | 07.12.2011 | ||
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
CH | 31.12.2011 | ||
LI | 31.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
PL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
PT | 09.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
RO | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
SK | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
EE | 07.12.2011 | ||
IE | 07.12.2011 | ||
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 07.03.2012 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
IS | 07.04.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 07.12.2011 | |
LT | 07.12.2011 | ||
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 07.12.2011 | |
LV | 07.12.2011 | ||
NL | 07.12.2011 | ||
SE | 07.12.2011 | ||
SI | 07.12.2011 | ||
GR | 08.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 07.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO0007844 (PLASTIC OMNIUM CIE [FR], et al) [Y] 9,11,13 * page 7, line 1 - page 10, line 31; figures 1,2,22,25 *; | [XY]EP1529685 (HELLA KGAA HUECK & CO [DE], et al) [X] 1-8,10,12,14,15 * paragraphs [0013] - [0022]; figure - * [Y] 9,11,13; | [A]EP1645799 (VALEO VISION [FR]) [A] 1-15* the whole document * |