EP2043823 - CONTACT DISPLACEMENT ACTUATOR SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 01.05.2015 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): LU, TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2011/52] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870, Winter Street Waltham MA 02451 / US | ||
Former [2009/15] | For all designated states Raytheon Sarcos, LLC 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
JACOBSEN, Stephen 274 South 1200 East Salt Lake City, UT 84102 / US | 02 /
OLIVIER, Marc 9638 South 2980 East Sandy, UT 84092 / US | [2009/15] | Representative(s) | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters IP LLP Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2014/10] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters Skygarden Erika-Mann-Strasse 11 80636 München / DE | ||
Former [2012/16] | Walker, Ross Thomson, et al Forresters 15 Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | ||
Former [2009/15] | Wombwell, Francis Potts, Kerr & Co. 15, Hamilton Square Birkenhead Merseyside CH41 6BR / GB | Application number, filing date | 07872565.2 | 17.07.2007 | [2009/15] | WO2007US16336 | Priority number, date | US20060831476P | 17.07.2006 Original published format: US 831476 P | US20070879448 | 16.07.2007 Original published format: US 879448 | [2009/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008094191 | Date: | 07.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2043823 | Date: | 08.04.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 07.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/15] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2043823 | Date: | 25.06.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 02.10.2008 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.05.2010 | Classification | IPC: | B25J1/00, A61H1/02 | [2010/22] | CPC: |
A61H1/024 (EP,US);
A61H1/0244 (EP,US);
A61H1/0255 (EP,US);
A61H3/00 (EP,US);
A61H3/008 (EP,US);
B25J1/00 (KR);
B25J13/08 (KR);
B25J9/0006 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0173 (EP,US);
A61H2201/0176 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1238 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1616 (EP,US);
A61H2201/163 (EP,US);
A61H2201/164 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1642 (EP,US);
A61H2201/165 (EP,US);
A61H2201/1676 (EP,US);
A61H2201/5007 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2009/15] | B25J1/00 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/15] | Title | German: | KONTAKTVERSCHIEBUNGS-BETÄTIGUNGSSYSTEM | [2009/15] | English: | CONTACT DISPLACEMENT ACTUATOR SYSTEM | [2009/15] | French: | SYSTÈME D'ACTIONNEUR DE DÉPLACEMENT À CONTACT | [2009/15] | Entry into regional phase | 20.01.2009 | National basic fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Search fee paid | 20.01.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.01.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 30.11.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 25.02.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.09.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 15.03.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 22.05.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.01.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.05.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 19.05.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.05.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP13156628.3 / EP2626176 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.02.2011 | Opposition(s) | 26.03.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/23] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.07.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 13.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 10.07.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2009 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   24.08.2009 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 17.07.2007 | AT | 25.06.2014 | BE | 25.06.2014 | BG | 25.06.2014 | CY | 25.06.2014 | CZ | 25.06.2014 | DK | 25.06.2014 | EE | 25.06.2014 | ES | 25.06.2014 | FI | 25.06.2014 | IT | 25.06.2014 | LT | 25.06.2014 | LV | 25.06.2014 | MC | 25.06.2014 | MT | 25.06.2014 | NL | 25.06.2014 | PL | 25.06.2014 | RO | 25.06.2014 | SE | 25.06.2014 | SI | 25.06.2014 | SK | 25.06.2014 | TR | 25.06.2014 | IE | 17.07.2014 | LU | 17.07.2014 | CH | 31.07.2014 | LI | 31.07.2014 | GR | 26.09.2014 | IS | 25.10.2014 | PT | 27.10.2014 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/32] | HU | 17.07.2007 | |
AT | 25.06.2014 | ||
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/28] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
MT | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2016/25] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
BG | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/50] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SI | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/37] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
IE | 17.07.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/30] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
BE | 25.06.2014 | ||
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/22] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
DK | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
IT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/20] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
CH | 31.07.2014 | ||
LI | 31.07.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/18] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
MC | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | AT | 25.06.2014 | |
CY | 25.06.2014 | ||
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
NL | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
IS | 25.10.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
PL | 25.06.2014 | ||
RO | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
PT | 27.10.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
CZ | 25.06.2014 | ||
EE | 25.06.2014 | ||
ES | 25.06.2014 | ||
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
SK | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
LV | 25.06.2014 | ||
SE | 25.06.2014 | ||
GR | 26.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
FI | 25.06.2014 | ||
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 25.06.2014 | |
LT | 25.06.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 25.06.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2006130594 (IKEUCHI YASUSHI [JP]) [X] 1-6,10-14,17,18,21 * paragraph [0061] - paragraph [0101] * [A] 7-9,15,16,19,20; | [A]US2006052732 (SHIMADA KEI [JP], et al) [A] 1-21 * the whole document *; | [A]DE102004029513 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE]) [A] 1-21 * the whole document * | International search | [Y]US2003223844 (SCHIELE ANDRE [NL], et al); | [Y]US2005166413 (CRAMPTON STEPHEN J [GB]); | [A]US5516249 (BRIMHALL OWEN D [US]); | [A]US6016385 (YEE ALBERT G [US], et al) | by applicant | US2006130594 | US2006000622 | US6957631 | US7066116 | US20050292908 | US20050293413 | US20070904245 | US20060393726 |