EP2054737 - METHOD FOR FUSING MULTIPLE GPS MEASUREMENT TYPES INTO A WEIGHTED LEAST SQUARES SOLUTION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.07.2015 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BE | published on 29.11.2017 [2017/48] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sierra Nevada Corporation 444 Salomon Circle Sparks, NV 89434 / US | [2009/19] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HANSEN, JR., Joseph, Henry 1473 W. Flint Meadow Drive Kaysville, Utah 84037 / US | 02 /
WRIGHT, William, G. 2274 Blossomwood Circle Sandy, Utah 84093 / US | [2009/19] | Representative(s) | Schultes, Stephan, et al Haseltine Lake LLP Lincoln House, 5th Floor 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | [2013/21] |
Former [2009/19] | Holtby, Christopher Lawrence Haseltine Lake 5th Floor, Lincoln House 300 High Holborn London WC1V 7JH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07872732.8 | 13.08.2007 | [2009/19] | WO2007US75832 | Priority number, date | US20060822195P | 11.08.2006 Original published format: US 822195 P | US20070838133 | 13.08.2007 Original published format: US 838133 | [2009/19] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008097346 | Date: | 14.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2054737 | Date: | 06.05.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 14.08.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/19] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2054737 | Date: | 24.09.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 08.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | G01S19/15, G01S19/51 | [2014/13] | CPC: |
G01S19/15 (EP,US);
G01S19/51 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2009/19] | G01S5/14 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/19] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR FUSION MEHRERER GPS-MESSTYPEN ZU EINER GEWICHTETEN KLEINSTQUADRATLÖSUNG | [2009/19] | English: | METHOD FOR FUSING MULTIPLE GPS MEASUREMENT TYPES INTO A WEIGHTED LEAST SQUARES SOLUTION | [2009/19] | French: | PROCÉDÉ POUR MÉLANGER DE MULTIPLES TYPES DE MESURE DE GPS DANS UNE SOLUTION DE MOINDRES CARRÉS PONDÉRÉS | [2009/19] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2009 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.02.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/19] | 27.10.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 06.12.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.04.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.03.2014 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 07.07.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 07.07.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 07.07.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | EP11185562.3 / EP2434313 | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.10.2009 | Opposition(s) | 25.06.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.08.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 11.08.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.08.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 19.08.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 13.08.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 13.08.2007 | AT | 24.09.2014 | BE | 24.09.2014 | BG | 24.09.2014 | CY | 24.09.2014 | CZ | 24.09.2014 | DK | 24.09.2014 | EE | 24.09.2014 | ES | 24.09.2014 | FI | 24.09.2014 | LT | 24.09.2014 | LV | 24.09.2014 | MC | 24.09.2014 | MT | 24.09.2014 | NL | 24.09.2014 | PL | 24.09.2014 | RO | 24.09.2014 | SE | 24.09.2014 | SI | 24.09.2014 | SK | 24.09.2014 | TR | 24.09.2014 | GR | 25.12.2014 | IS | 24.01.2015 | PT | 26.01.2015 | [2017/46] |
Former [2017/39] | HU | 13.08.2007 | |
AT | 24.09.2014 | ||
BG | 24.09.2014 | ||
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
TR | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
MT | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/18] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
MC | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/12] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SI | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/35] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
DK | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/25] | AT | 24.09.2014 | |
CY | 24.09.2014 | ||
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/24] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
PL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/23] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
CZ | 24.09.2014 | ||
EE | 24.09.2014 | ||
ES | 24.09.2014 | ||
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
SK | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
IS | 24.01.2015 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/22] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
RO | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
PT | 26.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/16] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
NL | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
LV | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 24.09.2014 | |
FI | 24.09.2014 | ||
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
GR | 25.12.2014 | ||
Former [2015/09] | FI | 24.09.2014 | |
LT | 24.09.2014 | ||
SE | 24.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | LT | 24.09.2014 | Cited in | International search | [X]US2006074558 (WILLIAMSON WALTON R [US], et al) [X] 1 * paragraph [0523] - paragraph [0524] * * paragraph [1129] - paragraph [1141] *; | [X]US5991691 (JOHNSON GREGORY BENGT [US]) [X] 1 * column 4, line 33 - column 6, line 36 * * column 16, line 45 - line 61 * | by applicant | US2006074558 | US5991691 |