EP2082053 - Process for producing microbial oil comprising polyunsaturated fatty acids [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/31] | OIL PRODUCING MICROBES AND METHODS OF MODIFICATION THEREOF | ||
[2015/49] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.02.2017 Database last updated on 17.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2018 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG | published on 19.09.2018 [2018/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | [2016/15] |
Former [2014/24] | For all designated states DSM Nutritional Products AG Wurmisweg 576 4303 Kaiseraugst / CH | ||
Former [2009/31] | For all designated states Ocean Nutrition Canada Ltd. 101 Research Drive Dartmouth, NS B2Y 4T6 / CA | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RADIANINGTYAS, Helia 675 Waverley Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 02 /
BURJA, Adam, M. 675 Waverley Street Palo Alto, CA 94301 / US | 03 /
BARROW, Colin, James 404 Francklyn Street Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 1A8 / CA | [2009/50] |
Former [2009/31] | 01 /
RADIANINGTYAS, Helia 5881 Spring Garden Road Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 1Y2 / CA | ||
02 /
BURJA, Adam, M. 5881 Spring Garden Road Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 1Y2 / CA | |||
03 /
BARROW, Colin, James 404 Francklyn Street Halifax, Nova Scotia B3H 1A8 / CA | Representative(s) | Leißler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte mbB Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2016/15] | Leissler-Gerstl, Gabriele Hoefer & Partner Patentanwälte Pilgersheimer Strasse 20 81543 München / DE | ||
Former [2013/10] | Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Hafenspitze Speditionstrasse 21 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | ||
Former [2009/31] | Storz, Ulrich Michalski Hüttermann & Partner Patentanwälte Neuer Zollhof 2 40221 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 07873362.3 | 30.07.2007 | [2009/31] | WO2007IB04596 | Priority number, date | US20060821084P | 01.08.2006 Original published format: US 821084 P | [2009/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008129358 | Date: | 30.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/44] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2082053 | Date: | 29.07.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 30.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/31] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2082053 | Date: | 13.04.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/15] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 03.03.2011 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.09.2012 | Classification | IPC: | C12P7/64 | [2009/31] | CPC: |
C12P7/6472 (EP,US);
A61P3/02 (EP);
A61P3/04 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P3/08 (EP);
A61P3/10 (EP);
A61P39/06 (EP);
A61P43/00 (EP);
A61P5/50 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2016/15] |
Former [2009/31] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | HR | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Herstellung von mikrobiellem Öl enthaltend mehrfach ungesättigte Fettsäuren | [2015/49] | English: | Process for producing microbial oil comprising polyunsaturated fatty acids | [2015/49] | French: | Procédé de production d'une huile microbienne contenant des acides gras polyinsaturés | [2015/49] |
Former [2009/31] | ÖLPRODUZIERENDE MIKROBEN UND VERFAHREN ZU IHRER MODIFIKATION | ||
Former [2009/31] | OIL PRODUCING MICROBES AND METHODS OF MODIFICATION THEREOF | ||
Former [2009/31] | MICROBES PRODUISANT DES HUILES ET PROCEDES DE MODIFICATION ASSOCIES | Entry into regional phase | 27.02.2009 | National basic fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Search fee paid | 27.02.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.02.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/31] | 15.03.2013 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 05.11.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.02.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 17.02.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.02.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 05.11.2015 | Opposition(s) | 16.01.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.02.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 06.08.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 16.07.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 10.07.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.06.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 14.07.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 10.07.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.07.2010 | 04   M06   Fee paid on   06.08.2010 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 30.07.2007 | AT | 13.04.2016 | BE | 13.04.2016 | BG | 13.04.2016 | CY | 13.04.2016 | CZ | 13.04.2016 | DK | 13.04.2016 | EE | 13.04.2016 | FI | 13.04.2016 | IS | 13.04.2016 | IT | 13.04.2016 | LT | 13.04.2016 | LV | 13.04.2016 | MC | 13.04.2016 | PL | 13.04.2016 | RO | 13.04.2016 | SE | 13.04.2016 | SI | 13.04.2016 | SK | 13.04.2016 | TR | 13.04.2016 | GR | 14.07.2016 | IE | 30.07.2016 | LU | 30.07.2016 | MT | 31.07.2016 | PT | 16.08.2016 | [2018/38] |
Former [2018/33] | HU | 30.07.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IS | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
MT | 31.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/29] | HU | 30.07.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
TR | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2018/28] | HU | 30.07.2007 | |
AT | 13.04.2016 | ||
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CY | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/37] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SI | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
IE | 30.07.2016 | ||
LU | 30.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/22] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
MC | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/10] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
SK | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/09] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
CZ | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
EE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
RO | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/07] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
DK | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2017/03] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
BE | 13.04.2016 | ||
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
IT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/52] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
SE | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/51] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
GR | 14.07.2016 | ||
PT | 16.08.2016 | ||
Former [2016/50] | AT | 13.04.2016 | |
FI | 13.04.2016 | ||
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
LV | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/49] | FI | 13.04.2016 | |
LT | 13.04.2016 | ||
PL | 13.04.2016 | ||
Former [2016/46] | LT | 13.04.2016 | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]JPH1175884 ; | [A]WO03033683 ; | [XPA]US2006275904 (ONO KAZUHISA [JP], et al); | [E]EP2110438 (UNIV MIYAZAKI [JP], et al); | International search | [Y]WO2004041251 (OCEAN NUTRITION CANADA LTD [CA], et al); | Examination | EP1818410 |