EP2084484 - HERMETIC COVERING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A PROJECTILE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 03.08.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham, MA 02451-1449 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/32] | For all designated states Raytheon Company 870 Winter Street Waltham Massachusetts 02451-1449 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MASON, James, S. 153 N. Spring Creek Drive Richardson, TX 75081-3962 / US | 02 /
WILSON, James, S. 3105 Brazos Drive Hurst, TX 76054 / US | [2009/32] | Representative(s) | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 100 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 8QQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/14] | Lawrence, John, et al Barker Brettell LLP 138 Hagley Road Edgbaston Birmingham B16 9PW / GB | ||
Former [2009/32] | Ljungberg, Robert Baker Botts (UK) LLP 41 Lothbury London EC2R 7HF / GB | Application number, filing date | 07873640.2 | 29.11.2007 | [2009/32] | WO2007US85895 | Priority number, date | US20060867907P | 30.11.2006 Original published format: US 867907 P | US20070946559 | 28.11.2007 Original published format: US 946559 | [2009/32] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008127441 | Date: | 23.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/43] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2084484 | Date: | 05.08.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 23.10.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/32] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2084484 | Date: | 28.09.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 05.02.2009 | Classification | IPC: | F41A35/02, F42B39/00, F41F3/052, F42B39/22 | [2009/32] | CPC: |
F42B39/00 (EP,US);
F41F3/042 (EP,US);
F41F3/073 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/32] | Title | German: | HERMETISCHES VERKLEIDUNGSSYSTEM UND VERFAHREN FÜR EIN GESCHOSS | [2009/32] | English: | HERMETIC COVERING SYSTEM AND METHOD FOR A PROJECTILE | [2009/32] | French: | SYSTÈME ET PROCÉDÉ DE COUVERTURE HERMÉTIQUE POUR UN PROJECTILE | [2009/32] | Entry into regional phase | 22.05.2009 | National basic fee paid | 22.05.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.05.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.05.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.05.2009 | Examination requested [2009/32] | 06.07.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 10.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.04.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 03.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 03.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 06.07.2010 | Opposition(s) | 29.06.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/36] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.11.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.11.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 28.09.2011 | BE | 28.09.2011 | CY | 28.09.2011 | CZ | 28.09.2011 | DK | 28.09.2011 | EE | 28.09.2011 | FI | 28.09.2011 | HU | 28.09.2011 | IT | 28.09.2011 | LT | 28.09.2011 | LV | 28.09.2011 | MT | 28.09.2011 | NL | 28.09.2011 | PL | 28.09.2011 | RO | 28.09.2011 | SE | 28.09.2011 | SI | 28.09.2011 | SK | 28.09.2011 | TR | 28.09.2011 | IE | 29.11.2011 | LU | 29.11.2011 | CH | 30.11.2011 | LI | 30.11.2011 | MC | 30.11.2011 | BG | 28.12.2011 | GR | 29.12.2011 | ES | 08.01.2012 | IS | 28.01.2012 | PT | 30.01.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
TR | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
LU | 29.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
LU | 29.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
BG | 28.12.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
LU | 29.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
ES | 08.01.2012 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
MT | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
IE | 29.11.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/37] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
PL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
DK | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
CH | 30.11.2011 | ||
LI | 30.11.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/29] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
MC | 30.11.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
EE | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
IT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
NL | 28.09.2011 | ||
RO | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
SK | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
PT | 30.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
CZ | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
IS | 28.01.2012 | ||
Former [2012/18] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
BE | 28.09.2011 | ||
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 28.09.2011 | |
CY | 28.09.2011 | ||
FI | 28.09.2011 | ||
LT | 28.09.2011 | ||
LV | 28.09.2011 | ||
SE | 28.09.2011 | ||
SI | 28.09.2011 | ||
GR | 29.12.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US2710096 (LANKFORD HARRY G) [A] 4* the whole document *; | [A]FR1200122 (LINCRUSTA) [A] 6,17 * abstract * * figure - *; | [X]GB843037 (SHORT BROTHERS & HARLAND LTD) [X] 1,3,9,10,12,14,20,21 * page 1, column RH, line 76 - line 82 * * page 2, column LH, line 39 - line 61 * * figure - *; | [A]EP1046878 (GIAT IND SA [FR]) [A] 1,12 * paragraph [0070] * * abstract * | by applicant | GB843037 |