EP2105004 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OVERRIDING DENUNCIATIONS OF UNWANTED TRAFFIC IN ONE OR MORE PACKET NETWORKS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 28.08.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.08.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 30.09.2015 [2015/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Alcatel-Lucent USA Inc. 600-700 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill, NJ 07974 / US | [2013/13] |
Former [2009/40] | For all designated states LUCENT TECHNOLOGIES INC. 600 Mountain Avenue Murray Hill NJ 07974-0636 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GROSSE, Eric, Henry 140 North Road Berkeley Heights, NJ 07922 / US | 02 /
MARTIN, Clifford, E. 802 N. Vosseller Avenue Martinsville, NJ 08836 / US | [2009/40] | Representative(s) | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Partnerschaftsgesellschaft mbB Gropiusplatz 10 70563 Stuttgart / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/40] | Kohler Schmid Möbus Patentanwälte Ruppmannstraße 27 70565 Stuttgart / DE | Application number, filing date | 07874085.9 | 23.10.2007 | [2009/40] | WO2007US22444 | Priority number, date | US20060592725 | 03.11.2006 Original published format: US 592725 | [2009/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008133644 | Date: | 06.11.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/45] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2105004 | Date: | 30.09.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 06.11.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 09.04.2009 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06 | [2009/40] | CPC: |
H04L63/145 (EP,KR,US);
H04L12/22 (KR);
H04L2463/141 (EP,KR,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/40] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR AUSSCHALTUNG VON UNGEWOLLTEM VERKEHR IN EINEM ODER MEHREREN PAKETNETZEN MITTELS STRING-ANALYSE | [2009/40] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR OVERRIDING DENUNCIATIONS OF UNWANTED TRAFFIC IN ONE OR MORE PACKET NETWORKS | [2009/40] | French: | METHODE ET DISPOSITIF POUR NEUTRALISER DES DENONCIATIONS DE TRAFFIC INDESIRABLE DANS UN OU PLUSIEURS RESEAUX DE PACKETS | [2009/40] | Entry into regional phase | 03.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 09.10.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 09.10.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 09.10.2009 | Examination requested [2009/47] | 18.11.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.03.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 01.05.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/40] | 28.05.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2015/40] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 18.11.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.10.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.10.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.10.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 23.10.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 24.10.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2014 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Rights in Rem or Legal Means of Execution | deleted | [2014/47] |
Former [2013/40] | ID: | 01 | |
For: | AT BE BG CH CY CZ DE DK EE ES FI FR GB GR HU IE IS IT LI LT LU LV MC MT NL PL PT RO SE SI SK TR | ||
Date: | 10.04.2013 | ||
[2014/47] | Cited in | International search | [X]WO0138999 (ESCOM CORP [US], et al) [X] 1-10 * abstract * * page 2, line 6 - line 18 * * page 4, line 20 - line 24 * * page 14, line 12 - page 16, line 5 * * page 62, line 9 - line 17 * * page 73, line 7 - page 77, line 7 * * figure 24 * * page 11, line 21 - page 12, line 4 * * page 65, line 8 - line 19 *; | [A]WO2006056223 (TELECOM ITALIA SPA [IT], et al) [A] 3-5,8-10 * abstract * * page 12, line 15 - line 31 *; | [A]WO2006090392 (RSA SECURITY INC [US], et al) [A] 3,8 * page 7, line 16 - line 27 *; | [A] - QUINN BOXNARROW COM R FINLAYSON LIVE NETWORKS B ET AL, "Session Description Protocol (SDP) Source Filters; rfc4570.txt", IETF STANDARD, INTERNET ENGINEERING TASK FORCE, IETF, CH, (20060701), ISSN 0000-0003, XP015055007 [A] 3-4,8-9 * page 2 - page 4 * |