EP2121746 - POTENT AND SELECTIVE MEDIATORS OF CHOLESTEROL EFFLUX [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.09.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2009/48] | For all designated states The Regents of the University of California 1111 Franklin Street, 12th Floor Oakland, CA 94607-5200 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BIELICKI, John K. 1008 Lakeridge Place San Ramon, CA 94582-4817 / US | 02 /
JOHANSSON, Jan 165 Merano Street Danville, California 94526 / US | [2009/48] | Representative(s) | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J A Kemp 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2011/46] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | ||
Former [2009/48] | Campbell, Patrick John Henry J.A. Kemp & Co. 14 South Square Gray's Inn London WC1R 5JJ / GB | Application number, filing date | 07874411.7 | 13.12.2007 | [2009/48] | WO2007US87477 | Priority number, date | US20060874909P | 13.12.2006 Original published format: US 874909 P | [2009/48] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008115303 | Date: | 25.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2121746 | Date: | 25.11.2009 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.09.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2009/48] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2121746 | Date: | 16.11.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/46] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.12.2008 | Classification | IPC: | C07K14/705 | [2009/48] | CPC: |
C07K14/775 (EP,US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P3/06 (EP);
A61P39/02 (EP);
A61P9/00 (EP);
A61P9/10 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/48] | Title | German: | POTENTE UND SELEKTIVE MITTLERSUBSTANZEN VON CHOLESTEROLEFFLUX | [2009/48] | English: | POTENT AND SELECTIVE MEDIATORS OF CHOLESTEROL EFFLUX | [2009/48] | French: | MÉDIATEURS PUISSANTS ET SÉLECTIFS D'EFFLUX DE CHOLESTÉROL | [2009/48] | Entry into regional phase | 10.07.2009 | National basic fee paid | 10.07.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.07.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.07.2009 | Examination requested [2009/48] | 28.09.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.12.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 18.06.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.10.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 02.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 01.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 01.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.12.2009 | Opposition(s) | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/43] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 16.11.2011 | CZ | 16.11.2011 | EE | 16.11.2011 | HU | 16.11.2011 | LT | 16.11.2011 | LV | 16.11.2011 | MT | 16.11.2011 | PL | 16.11.2011 | RO | 16.11.2011 | SI | 16.11.2011 | SK | 16.11.2011 | TR | 16.11.2011 | LU | 13.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | BG | 16.02.2012 | GR | 17.02.2012 | IS | 16.03.2012 | PT | 16.03.2012 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
TR | 16.11.2011 | ||
LU | 13.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
LU | 13.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2013/14] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
MT | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/36] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
RO | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
SK | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/35] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
EE | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
BG | 16.02.2012 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/34] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
CZ | 16.11.2011 | ||
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/28] | CY | 16.11.2011 | |
LT | 16.11.2011 | ||
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/26] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
PL | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/24] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
LV | 16.11.2011 | ||
SI | 16.11.2011 | ||
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/23] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
GR | 17.02.2012 | ||
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
PT | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/21] | LT | 16.11.2011 | |
IS | 16.03.2012 | ||
Former [2012/20] | LT | 16.11.2011 | Cited in | International search | [Y]WO2005058938 (UNIV CALIFORNIA [US], et al) [Y] 1-45,56-90 * page 65, paragraph 223; claim 1 *; | [X]WO2006020040 (TUFTS COLLEGE [US], et al) [X] 46-55,91-103 * page 3, lines 18,19; claim 5 * * page 16, lines 13,14; claims 12,17,31 *; | [X] - RAMPRASAD M P ET AL, "Sustained-delivery of an apolipoproteinE-peptidomimetic using multivesicular liposomes lowers serum cholesterol levels", JOURNAL OF CONTROLLED RELEASE, ELSEVIER, AMSTERDAM, NL, (20020219), vol. 79, no. 1-3, ISSN 0168-3659, pages 207 - 218, XP004340926 [X] 46,49,52,53,55,94-100 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/S0168-3659(01)00552-1 | [Y] - SPARROW J T ET AL, "Apolipoprotein E: phospholipid binding studies with synthetic peptides from the carboxyl terminus.", BIOCHEMISTRY 4 FEB 1992, (19920204), vol. 31, no. 4, ISSN 0006-2960, pages 1065 - 1068, XP002501478 [Y] 1-45,56-90 * abstract * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/bi00119a015 | [Y] - SONG Y M ET AL, "Effects of l- or d-Pro incorporation into hydrophobic or hydrophilic helix face of amphipathic alpha-helical model peptide on structure and cell selectivity", BIOCHEMICAL AND BIOPHYSICAL RESEARCH COMMUNICATIONS, ACADEMIC PRESS INC. ORLANDO, FL, US, (20040206), vol. 314, no. 2, ISSN 0006-291X, pages 615 - 621, XP004485007 [Y] 1-45,56-82 * abstract * * page 615, column RIGHT, lines 11-13 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.bbrc.2003.12.142 |