Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2009143457 | ![]() | 29.04.2010 | A3 | WO2009143457 | 26.11.2009 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021069324 | ![]() | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016855656 | 22.04.2020 | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201213599695 | 30.08.2012 | US201314096582 | 04.12.2013 | US201815875517 | 19.01.2018 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2021069323 | ![]() | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201313930953 | 28.06.2013 | US201715823852 | 28.11.2017 | US201213599701 | 30.08.2012 | US202016855622 | 22.04.2020 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2018169226 | ![]() | 21.06.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84339810 | 26.07.2010 | US201815868460 | 11.01.2018 | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201514849212 | 09.09.2015 | US201313886666 | 03.05.2013 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | US84339510 | 26.07.2010 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2016058860 | ![]() | 03.03.2016 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84339810 | 26.07.2010 | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201514849212 | 09.09.2015 | US201313886666 | 03.05.2013 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | US84339510 | 26.07.2010 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9950063 | ![]() | 24.04.2018 | B2 | US2015335736 | 26.11.2015 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201313930953 | 28.06.2013 | US201213599701 | 30.08.2012 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US201414581062 | 23.12.2014 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9907845 | ![]() | 06.03.2018 | B2 | US2014341970 | 20.11.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201213599695 | 30.08.2012 | US201314096582 | 04.12.2013 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2014193459 | ![]() | 10.07.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84339810 | 26.07.2010 | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201313886666 | 03.05.2013 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US9987355 | ![]() | 05.06.2018 | B2 | US2014037691 | 06.02.2014 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201313930953 | 28.06.2013 | US201213599701 | 30.08.2012 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8840908 | ![]() | 23.09.2014 | B2 | US2013084307 | 04.04.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201213599701 | 30.08.2012 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8609114 | ![]() | 17.12.2013 | B2 | US2013058997 | 07.03.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201213599695 | 30.08.2012 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8343512 | ![]() | 01.01.2013 | B2 | US2012039994 | 16.02.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US201113277919 | 20.10.2011 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011070290 | ![]() | 24.03.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84339810 | 26.07.2010 | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2011014274 | ![]() | 20.01.2011 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US84339510 | 26.07.2010 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2009181078 | ![]() | 16.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8273361 | ![]() | 25.09.2012 | B2 | US2008131466 | 05.06.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US11376325 | ![]() | 05.07.2022 | B2 | US2020376116 | 03.12.2020 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202016899729 | 12.06.2020 | US84339810 | 26.07.2010 | US201815868460 | 11.01.2018 | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201514849212 | 09.09.2015 | US201313886666 | 03.05.2013 | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | US84339510 | 26.07.2010 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10792359 | ![]() | 06.10.2020 | B2 | US2018236063 | 23.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201213599695 | 30.08.2012 | US201314096582 | 04.12.2013 | US201815875517 | 19.01.2018 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | US10765736 | ![]() | 08.09.2020 | B2 | US2018221470 | 09.08.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US86212207 | 26.09.2007 | US201313930953 | 28.06.2013 | US201715823852 | 28.11.2017 | US201213599701 | 30.08.2012 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101378872B | ![]() | 11.04.2014 | B1 | KR20090079209 | 21.07.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5443164B | ![]() | 19.03.2014 | B2 | JP2010504914 | 18.02.2010 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3795173 | ![]() | 24.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP18165195 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | EP12153256 | 26.09.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3403667 | ![]() | 22.07.2020 | B1 | EP3403667 | 21.11.2018 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | EP12153256 | 26.09.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP3251680 | ![]() | 20.09.2023 | C0 | EP3251680 | ![]() | 20.09.2023 | B1 | EP3251680 | 06.12.2017 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | EP09751685 | 22.05.2009 | EP13172042 | 22.05.2009 | WO2009US45033 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2664332 | ![]() | 29.03.2017 | B1 | EP2664332 | 20.11.2013 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | EP09751685 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2486938 | ![]() | 09.05.2018 | B1 | EP2486938 | 15.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2484375 | ![]() | 23.05.2018 | B1 | EP2484375 | 15.08.2012 | A3 | EP2484375 | 08.08.2012 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2468300 | ![]() | 20.12.2017 | B1 | EP2468300 | 27.06.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2291190 | ![]() | 09.03.2011 | A2 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | WO2009US45033 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CA2662921 | ![]() | 20.11.2018 | C | CA2662921 | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2007354917B | ![]() | 06.06.2013 | B2 | AU2007354917 | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2068918 | ![]() | 03.07.2024 | B2 | EP2068918 | 02.05.2012 | B1 | EP2068918 | 17.06.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ATE555808T | 15.05.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | BRPI0716959 | 29.10.2013 | A2 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101516396B | 09.10.2013 | B | CN101516396 | 26.08.2009 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN102112135B | 21.05.2014 | B | CN102112135 | 29.06.2011 | A | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | WO2009US45033 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN103705919B | 28.09.2016 | B | CN103705919 | 09.04.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | CN200780035774 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1112943T | 13.04.2016 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1119822T | 27.06.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120305T | 10.07.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | CY1120328T | 10.07.2019 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2068918T | 02.09.2024 | T4 | DK2068918T | 30.07.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2468300T | 29.01.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2484375T | 16.07.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2486938T | 14.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | DK2664332T | 08.05.2017 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | EP09751685 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2387327T | 19.11.2024 | T5 | ES2387327T | 20.09.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | FI2068918T | 16.08.2024 | T4 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1132934 | 12.03.2010 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HK1159485 | 03.08.2012 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | WO2009US45033 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HRP20170585T | 16.06.2017 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | EP13172042 | 22.05.2009 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE031740T | 28.07.2017 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US15466308 | 22.05.2008 | US13412708 | 05.06.2008 | US35171009 | 09.01.2009 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2068918T | 02.12.2024 | T5 | PL2068918T | 31.10.2012 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2468300T | 30.04.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | EP12153267 | 26.09.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2484375T | 28.09.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP12153249 | 26.09.2007 | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PL2486938T | 31.08.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | EP12153256 | 26.09.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2068918T | 30.10.2024 | T2 | SI2068918T | 28.09.2012 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP07875082 | 26.09.2007 | WO2007US21017 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2468300T | 30.03.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | EP12153267 | 26.09.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2484375T | 31.08.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | EP12153249 | 26.09.2007 | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | SI2486938T | 28.09.2018 | T1 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | EP12153256 | 26.09.2007 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2008153541 | ![]() | 18.12.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2019070007 | ![]() | 09.05.2019 | A | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6463808B | ![]() | 06.02.2019 | B2 | JP2018024656 | 15.02.2018 | A | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP6190031B | ![]() | 30.08.2017 | B2 | JP2017081921 | 18.05.2017 | A | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP2016000738 | ![]() | 07.01.2016 | A | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP5778725B | ![]() | 16.09.2015 | B2 | JP2014012698 | 23.01.2014 | A | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2657392T | 05.03.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2673046T | 19.06.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2675915T | 13.07.2018 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | ES2822058T | 28.04.2021 | T3 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE036180T | 28.06.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE037808T | 28.09.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | HUE037901T | 28.09.2018 | T2 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2468300T | 12.02.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2484375T | 10.07.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | LT2486938T | 25.06.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2068918E | 06.08.2012 | E | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2468300T | 30.01.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2484375T | 09.07.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | PT2486938T | 12.06.2018 | T | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201807756T | 21.06.2018 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | Publication No. | Date | Type | TR201809043T | 23.07.2018 | T4 | Priority number | Date | US84740406 | 26.09.2006 | Type | ![]() | EP2484375 | Application refused : 06.07.2012 | EP2486938 | EP2468300 | EP3403667 | EP3795173 |