EP2219480 - ADJUSTABLE RESERVOIR FOR ROD-LIKE ARTICLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.03.2012 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.09.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 30.10.2013 [2013/44] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London, WC2R 3LA / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | For all designated states British American Tobacco (Investments) Ltd Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | Inventor(s) | 01 /
FALLON, Gary British American Tobacco (Investments) Limited Globe House 1 Water Street London WC2R 3LA / GB | [2010/34] | Representative(s) | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2010/34] | Read, Matthew Charles, et al Venner Shipley LLP 20 Little Britain London EC1A 7DH / GB | Application number, filing date | 07875272.2 | 17.12.2007 | [2010/34] | WO2007IB04722 | Priority number, date | GB20070000075 | 03.01.2007 Original published format: GB 0700075 | [2010/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2008081160 | Date: | 10.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/28] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2219480 | Date: | 25.08.2010 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 10.07.2008 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2010/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2219480 | Date: | 27.04.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/17] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | EP | 24.06.2010 | Classification | IPC: | A24C5/35, B65G47/51 | [2010/34] | CPC: |
B65G47/5131 (EP,US);
A24C5/35 (EP,US);
B65G47/5122 (EP,US);
B65G47/5127 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2010/34] | Title | German: | VERSTELLBARER BEHÄLTER FÜR STANGENFÖRMIGE ARTIKEL | [2010/34] | English: | ADJUSTABLE RESERVOIR FOR ROD-LIKE ARTICLES | [2010/34] | French: | RÉSERVOIR RÉGLABLE POUR ARTICLES DE TYPE BÂTONNETS | [2010/34] | Entry into regional phase | 16.06.2009 | National basic fee paid | 16.06.2009 | Designation fee(s) paid | 16.06.2009 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 16.06.2009 | Examination requested [2010/34] | 04.08.2010 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.12.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.03.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 15.03.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 30.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/14] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.12.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.12.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 27.04.2011 | BE | 27.04.2011 | CY | 27.04.2011 | DK | 27.04.2011 | EE | 27.04.2011 | FI | 27.04.2011 | LT | 27.04.2011 | LV | 27.04.2011 | MT | 27.04.2011 | NL | 27.04.2011 | RO | 27.04.2011 | SE | 27.04.2011 | SI | 27.04.2011 | SK | 27.04.2011 | TR | 27.04.2011 | BG | 27.07.2011 | GR | 28.07.2011 | ES | 07.08.2011 | IS | 27.08.2011 | PT | 29.08.2011 | IE | 17.12.2011 | LU | 17.12.2011 | MC | 31.12.2011 | [2013/44] |
Former [2013/29] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
BG | 27.07.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.12.2011 | ||
LU | 17.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.12.2011 | ||
LU | 17.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2013/14] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
MT | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/47] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
IE | 17.12.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/34] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
MC | 31.12.2011 | ||
Former [2012/12] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
DK | 27.04.2011 | ||
EE | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
RO | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
SK | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
BE | 27.04.2011 | ||
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
NL | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/52] | AT | 27.04.2011 | |
CY | 27.04.2011 | ||
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/50] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
LV | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
SI | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
IS | 27.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 27.04.2011 | |
FI | 27.04.2011 | ||
LT | 27.04.2011 | ||
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
GR | 28.07.2011 | ||
ES | 07.08.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/48] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
SE | 27.04.2011 | ||
PT | 29.08.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | LT | 27.04.2011 | |
PT | 29.08.2011 | Cited in | International search | [A]US4078648 (HINCHCLIFFE DENNIS, et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract *; | [A]EP1344462 (MOLINS PLC [GB]) [A] 1-16* abstract *; | [A]DE102004063256 (HAUNI MASCHINENBAU AG [DE]) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0001] , [0015] - [0017]; figure - * | by applicant | WO02085144 | US2003000811 | EP1344463 | EP1445218 | WO2004085293 |