14.04.2017 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] |
06.05.2016 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 08.06.2016 [2016/23] |
03.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.05.2016 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
02.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
08.10.2015 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
02.09.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
11.05.2015 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
08.05.2015 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 10.06.2015 [2015/24] |
09.04.2015 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
04.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.08.2014 |
Publication of search report |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
29.08.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
29.08.2014 |
Change - classification |
published on 01.10.2014 [2014/40] |
04.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
29.03.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 01.05.2013 [2013/18] |
01.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.02.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
23.01.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |
23.01.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 25.02.2009 [2009/09] |