EP2028741 - Hybrid-type superconducting fault current limiter [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 14.04.2017 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 14.04.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 17.05.2017 [2017/20] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Korea Electric Power Corporation 167 Samsung-Dong Gangnam-Ku Seoul 153-801 / KR | [2013/18] |
Former [2009/09] | For all designated states Korea Electric Power Corporation 167 Samsung-Dong Gangnam-Ku Seoul 153-801 / KR | ||
For all designated states LS Industrial Systems Co., Ltd 84-11, 5Ga Namdaemun-Ro Jung-Gu Seoul / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Hyun, Ok-Bae B102, Young village, No. 298-7 Jeonmin-dong Yuseong-gu, Daejeon / KR | [2009/09] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2016/23] |
Former [2009/09] | Grünecker, Kinkeldey, Stockmair & Schwanhäusser Anwaltssozietät Leopoldstrasse 4 80802 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08000312.2 | 09.01.2008 | [2009/09] | Priority number, date | KR20070083221 | 20.08.2007 Original published format: KR 20070083221 | [2009/09] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2028741 | Date: | 25.02.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/09] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2028741 | Date: | 01.10.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/40] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2028741 | Date: | 08.06.2016 | Language: | EN | [2016/23] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.08.2014 | Classification | IPC: | H02H9/02, H01H9/54, H02H7/00 | [2014/40] | CPC: |
H02H7/001 (EP,US);
H02H9/02 (EP,KR,US);
H01F6/00 (KR);
H10N60/30 (KR);
H01H9/547 (EP,US);
H01H9/548 (EP,US);
Y02E40/60 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2009/09] | H02H9/02 | Designated contracting states | DE [2015/24] |
Former [2009/09] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Hybrider supraleitender Fehlerstrombegrenzer | [2009/09] | English: | Hybrid-type superconducting fault current limiter | [2009/09] | French: | Limiteur de courant de défaut à superconduction de type hybride | [2009/09] | Examination procedure | 09.01.2008 | Examination requested [2009/09] | 30.03.2015 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.04.2015 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 12.05.2015 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 09.10.2015 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 15.02.2016 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.04.2016 | Fee for grant paid | 26.04.2016 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.04.2016 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 09.10.2015 | Opposition(s) | 09.03.2017 | No opposition filed within time limit [2017/20] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 29.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 29.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 29.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 27.01.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2007139832 (LEE BANG-WOOK [KR], et al); | [E]US2008043382 (LEE BANG-WOOK [KR], et al) | by applicant | KR20070083221 |