13.10.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] |
01.09.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.10.2017 [2017/40] |
25.08.2017 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 27.09.2017 [2017/39] |
16.12.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.01.2017 [2017/03] |
20.05.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.06.2016 [2016/25] |
15.01.2016 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 17.02.2016 [2016/07] |
23.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 25.11.2015 [2015/48] |
16.10.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] |
18.09.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 21.10.2015 [2015/43] |
21.08.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 23.09.2015 [2015/39] |
31.07.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 02.09.2015 [2015/36] |
19.06.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 22.07.2015 [2015/30] |
13.03.2015 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 15.04.2015 [2015/16] |
13.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.03.2015 [2015/12] |
06.02.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 11.03.2015 [2015/11] |
30.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 04.03.2015 [2015/10] |
16.01.2015 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 18.02.2015 [2015/08] |
05.12.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 07.01.2015 [2015/02] |
07.11.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 10.12.2014 [2014/50] |
31.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 03.12.2014 [2014/49] |
24.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 26.11.2014 [2014/48] |
17.10.2014 |
Lapse of the patent in a contracting state |
published on 19.11.2014 [2014/47] |
04.04.2014 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 07.05.2014 [2014/19] |
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
03.04.2014 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
28.01.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
09.12.2013 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
08.02.2013 |
Change - applicant |
published on 13.03.2013 [2013/11] |
25.01.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
25.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
15.06.2010 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
19.02.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 24.03.2010 [2010/12] |
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
22.01.2010 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.01.2010 |
First examination report |
|
25.12.2009 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 27.01.2010 [2010/04] |
12.06.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 15.07.2009 [2009/29] |
27.06.2008 |
Change - applicant |
published on 30.07.2008 [2008/31] |