EP2079141 - Starting device for an electromotor with integrated safety technology [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 13.03.2015 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.10.2017 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): BG, HU, TR | published on 15.11.2017 [2017/46] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Siemens Aktiengesellschaft Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | [2013/11] |
Former [2009/29] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Braune, Christian Paradeplatz 3 92224 Amberg / DE | 02 /
Fröhlich, Paul Theodor-Heuss-Strasse 5 92237 Sulzbach-Rosenberg / DE | 03 /
Krämer, Werner Ströberstrasse 7 92421 Schwandorf / DE | 04 /
Neumann, Bernhard Untere Leitenstrasse 16 90556 Cadolzburg / DE | 05 /
Prölss, Manfred Schlehenweg 12 92263 Ebermannsdorf / DE | 06 /
Schumann, Gordon Schenkstrasse 55 91052 Erlangen / DE | [2009/29] | Application number, filing date | 08000495.5 | 11.01.2008 | [2009/29] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2079141 | Date: | 15.07.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2079141 | Date: | 07.05.2014 | Language: | DE | [2014/19] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H02H7/08, G05B9/03 | [2009/29] | CPC: |
H02H7/0844 (EP);
G05B9/03 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/29] | Title | German: | Anschalteinrichtung für einen Elektromotor mit integrierter Sicherheitstechnik | [2009/29] | English: | Starting device for an electromotor with integrated safety technology | [2009/29] | French: | Dispositif de démarrage pour un moteur électrique doté d'une technique de sécurité intégrée | [2009/29] | Examination procedure | 18.12.2009 | Examination requested [2010/04] | 28.01.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 31.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 10.12.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 20.03.2014 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | 31.03.2014 | Fee for grant paid | 31.03.2014 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.01.2010 | Opposition(s) | 10.02.2015 | No opposition filed within time limit [2015/16] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 18.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 11.01.2008 | BG | 07.05.2014 | CY | 07.05.2014 | CZ | 07.05.2014 | DK | 07.05.2014 | EE | 07.05.2014 | ES | 07.05.2014 | FI | 07.05.2014 | HR | 07.05.2014 | LT | 07.05.2014 | LV | 07.05.2014 | MC | 07.05.2014 | MT | 07.05.2014 | NL | 07.05.2014 | PL | 07.05.2014 | RO | 07.05.2014 | SI | 07.05.2014 | SK | 07.05.2014 | TR | 07.05.2014 | NO | 07.08.2014 | GR | 08.08.2014 | IS | 07.09.2014 | PT | 08.09.2014 | AT | 11.01.2015 | GB | 11.01.2015 | IE | 11.01.2015 | LU | 11.01.2015 | BE | 31.01.2015 | CH | 31.01.2015 | LI | 31.01.2015 | [2017/39] |
Former [2017/03] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
MT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
AT | 11.01.2015 | ||
GB | 11.01.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/25] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
AT | 11.01.2015 | ||
GB | 11.01.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2016/07] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
GB | 11.01.2015 | ||
IE | 11.01.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
GB | 11.01.2015 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
CH | 31.01.2015 | ||
LI | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/43] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
MC | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/39] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
LU | 11.01.2015 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/36] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SI | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/30] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
BE | 31.01.2015 | ||
Former [2015/12] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
NL | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/11] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
RO | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/10] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
CZ | 07.05.2014 | ||
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
EE | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
SK | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/08] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
DK | 07.05.2014 | ||
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2015/02] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
PT | 08.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/50] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
ES | 07.05.2014 | ||
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
HR | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
LV | 07.05.2014 | ||
PL | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
GR | 08.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/49] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
FI | 07.05.2014 | ||
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
NO | 07.08.2014 | ||
IS | 07.09.2014 | ||
Former [2014/48] | CY | 07.05.2014 | |
LT | 07.05.2014 | ||
Former [2014/47] | CY | 07.05.2014 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE102005028559 (DOLD & SOEHNE KG E [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract *; | [A]DE102006046286 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1 * abstract * |