EP1947828 - Mobile communication terminal, method of interconnecting specific content to abbreviated number thereof and method for playing abbreviated number interconnected content thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 16.10.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.10.2015 | Change - refusal | published on 18.11.2015 [2015/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Kim, Jong Hwan LG Electronics Inc. IP Group 60-39 Kasan-dong Kumchon-gu Seoul 153-801 / KR | [2008/30] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/30] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08000777.6 | 16.01.2008 | [2008/30] | Priority number, date | KR20070006324 | 19.01.2007 Original published format: KR 20070006324 | [2008/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1947828 | Date: | 23.07.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/30] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/247 | [2008/30] | CPC: |
H04M1/576 (EP,US);
H04B1/40 (KR);
H04M1/2745 (EP,US);
H04M1/27475 (EP,US);
H04M1/56 (EP,US);
H04M1/7243 (EP,US);
H04M2250/22 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/30] | Title | German: | Mobiles Kommunikationsendgerät, Verfahren zur Verbindung spezifischer Inhalte mit einer abgekürzten Nummer dafür und Verfahren zum Abspielen von mit einer abgekürzten Nummer verbundenen Inhalten dafür | [2008/30] | English: | Mobile communication terminal, method of interconnecting specific content to abbreviated number thereof and method for playing abbreviated number interconnected content thereof | [2008/30] | French: | Terminal de communication mobile, procédé d'interconnexion de contenu spécifique vers un nombre abrégé correspondant et procédé correspondant de lecture de contenu interconnecté de nombre abrégé | [2008/30] | Examination procedure | 22.01.2009 | Examination requested [2009/11] | 27.02.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 25.06.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 24.03.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.09.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.01.2013 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.12.2014 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/47] | 04.12.2014 | Date of oral proceedings | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/24] | 28.01.2015 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2015/47] | 28.01.2015 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2015/24] | 28.01.2015 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 27.02.2009 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 19.01.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 30.01.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.01.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1233599 (MICROSOFT CORP [US]) [X] 1-25 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] * * paragraph [0019] - paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0026] - paragraph [0029] * * paragraph [0043] - paragraph [0046] *; | [X]WO2004112361 (SIEMENS AG [DE], et al) [X] 1-25 * page 1, lines 9-34 ** page 6, line 6 - page 8, line 9 * | Examination | US2002094806 | US2004080518 | US2006099978 | by applicant | EP1233599 | WO2004112361 |