EP1953484 - Refrigeration and/or freezer device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 11.01.2013 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 11.01.2013 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 13.02.2013 [2013/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Liebherr-Hausgeräte Ochsenhausen GmbH Memminger Strasse 77 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | [2008/32] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gerner, Jürgen, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Marquard-von-Schwendi-Strasse 12 88477 Schwendi / DE | 02 /
Dobler, Kai, Dipl.-Ing. (FH) Dietenwenger Strasse 17 88416 Ochsenhausen / DE | [2008/32] | Representative(s) | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz Seidler Gossel Rechtsanwälte Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/32] | Herrmann, Uwe, et al Lorenz - Seidler - Gossel, Widenmayerstrasse 23 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001146.3 | 22.01.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | DE20071003279 | 23.01.2007 Original published format: DE102007003279 | DE20071007825 | 16.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007007825 | [2008/32] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953484 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/32] | Classification | IPC: | F25D23/10 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
F25D23/10 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/32] | Extension states | AL | Not yet paid | BA | Not yet paid | MK | Not yet paid | RS | Not yet paid | Title | German: | Kühl- und/oder Gefriergerät | [2008/32] | English: | Refrigeration and/or freezer device | [2008/32] | French: | Appareil de réfrigération et/ou de refroidissement | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 01.08.2012 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2013/07] | 24.09.2012 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2013/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.01.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.01.2012 | 05   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. |