Extract from the Register of European Patents
EP Event history: EP2083167
Date |
Description |
European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
16.03.2018 |
No opposition filed within time limit |
published on 18.04.2018 [2018/16] |
07.04.2017 |
(Expected) grant |
published on 10.05.2017 [2017/19] |
05.04.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for grant |
|
05.04.2017 |
New entry: Payment of fee for publishing/printing |
|
03.04.2017 |
New entry: Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) |
|
06.02.2017 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
02.01.2017 |
New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent |
|
19.08.2016 |
New entry: Reply to examination report |
|
30.04.2016 |
New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit |
|
22.04.2016 |
First examination report |
|
05.02.2016 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
06.02.2015 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
05.02.2014 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
04.02.2013 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
03.02.2012 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
28.01.2011 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
18.06.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: legal effect |
|
05.03.2010 |
Definitive list of designations |
published on 07.04.2010 [2010/14] |
02.03.2010 |
New entry: Loss of particular rights: despatch of communication + time limit |
|
05.02.2010 |
Request for examination filed |
published on 10.03.2010 [2010/10] |
27.01.2010 |
New entry: Renewal fee paid |
|
01.10.2009 |
Amendment by applicant |
|
26.06.2009 |
Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin |
published on 29.07.2009 [2009/31] |