Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8313125 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2012 | B2 | US2009184512 | 23.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08001220 | 23.01.2008 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP2083167 | Global Dossier | 10.05.2017 | B1 | EP2083167 | 29.07.2009 | A1 | Priority number | Date | EP08001220 | 23.01.2008 |