EP2008928 - Bicycle control device [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.08.2012 Database last updated on 27.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 19.09.2012 [2012/38] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77, Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/01] | For all designated states SHIMANO INC. 3-77 Oimatsu-cho, Sakai-ku, Sakai City Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Miki, Yoshimitsu 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/01] | 01 /
Miki, Yoshimitsu 3-77 Oimatsu-cho Sakai-ku Sakai City, Osaka 590-8577 / JP | Representative(s) | Hofmann, Harald, et al Sonnenberg Fortmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | [2011/41] |
Former [2009/01] | Hofmann, Harald, et al 24IP Law Group Sonnenberg Fortmann Postfach 33 08 65 80068 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001436.8 | 25.01.2008 | [2009/01] | Priority number, date | US20070767859 | 25.06.2007 Original published format: US 767859 | [2009/01] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2008928 | Date: | 31.12.2008 | Language: | EN | [2009/01] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2008928 | Date: | 11.02.2009 | [2009/07] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2008928 | Date: | 12.10.2011 | Language: | EN | [2011/41] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.01.2009 | Classification | IPC: | B62M25/04, B62L3/02 | [2009/01] | CPC: |
B62M25/04 (EP,US);
B62K23/06 (EP,US);
B62L3/02 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20037 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20043 (EP,US);
Y10T74/20287 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, IT [2009/42] |
Former [2009/01] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Steuerungseinrichtung für ein Fahrrad | [2009/01] | English: | Bicycle control device | [2009/01] | French: | Dispositif de commande d'une bicyclette | [2009/01] | Examination procedure | 17.03.2009 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.08.2009 | Examination requested [2009/38] | 12.08.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 17.09.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 07.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.08.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 31.03.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 10.08.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 10.08.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 07.04.2010 | Opposition(s) | 13.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/38] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.01.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1736404 (CAMPAGNOLO SRL [IT]) [X] 1,3,5,6 * abstract *; | [DX]US5400675 (NAGANO MASASHI [JP]) [DX] 1 * abstract * | by applicant | US5400675 | US5257683 | EP1736404 |