EP1909464 - Method and apparatus for mobile station application to receive and transmit raw packetized data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 21.02.2014 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.07.2016 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 17.08.2016 [2016/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2008/15] | For all designated states QUALCOMM Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego CA 92121-1714 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Abrol, Nischal, @c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | 02 /
Gilkey, Harold, @c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | [2013/16] |
Former [2008/38] | 01 /
Abrol, Nischal, c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | ||
02 /
Gilkey, Harold, c/o Qualcomm Incorporated 5775 Morehouse Drive San Diego, CA 92121-1714 / US | |||
Former [2008/15] | 01 /
Abrol, Nischal 7260 Calle Cristobal 41 San Diego, CA 92126 / US | ||
02 /
Gilkey, Harold Apartment 1432, 3717 Nobel Drive San Diego, CA 92122 / US | Representative(s) | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Partnerschaft mbB Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Gewürzmühlstraße 5 80538 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2013/16] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstrasse 5 80538 München / DE | ||
Former [2008/15] | Carstens, Dirk Wilhelm Wagner & Geyer Gewürzmühlstraße 5 D-80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001562.1 | 29.03.2001 | [2008/15] | Priority number, date | US20000539499 | 30.03.2000 Original published format: US 539499 | [2008/15] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1909464 | Date: | 09.04.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/15] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1909464 | Date: | 23.04.2008 | [2008/17] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1909464 | Date: | 17.04.2013 | Language: | EN | [2013/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H04L29/06, H04L29/08 | [2008/15] | CPC: |
H04L69/16 (EP,US);
H04L69/00 (KR);
H04L67/04 (EP,US);
H04L69/162 (EP,US);
H04L67/564 (EP,US);
H04W76/10 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, CH, CY, DE, DK, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, TR [2008/15] | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung für eine Mobilstationsanwendung zum Empfangen und Senden von Rohdatenpaketen | [2008/15] | English: | Method and apparatus for mobile station application to receive and transmit raw packetized data | [2008/15] | French: | Procédé et appareil pour l'application d'une station mobile pour la réception et la transmission de données brutes en paquets | [2008/15] | Examination procedure | 28.01.2008 | Examination requested [2008/15] | 05.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 16.03.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.05.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 25.11.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.08.2012 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 04.09.2012 | 04.09.2012 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 13.09.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.01.2013 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | 25.02.2013 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.03.2013 | Fee for grant paid | 05.03.2013 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP01924454.0 / EP1273149 | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued (EP20010924454) is 01.12.2004 | Opposition(s) | 20.01.2014 | No opposition filed within time limit [2014/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 28.01.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 06.03.2009 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 08.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 10.03.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 07.03.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 08.03.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 17.04.2013 | BE | 17.04.2013 | CY | 17.04.2013 | DK | 17.04.2013 | FI | 17.04.2013 | IT | 17.04.2013 | MC | 17.04.2013 | NL | 17.04.2013 | SE | 17.04.2013 | TR | 17.04.2013 | GR | 18.07.2013 | ES | 28.07.2013 | PT | 19.08.2013 | [2016/33] |
Former [2016/27] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
MC | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/14] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
NL | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/11] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
IT | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2014/09] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
DK | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/52] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
CY | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/49] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
BE | 17.04.2013 | ||
FI | 17.04.2013 | ||
SE | 17.04.2013 | ||
GR | 18.07.2013 | ||
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | AT | 17.04.2013 | |
ES | 28.07.2013 | ||
PT | 19.08.2013 | ||
Former [2013/47] | PT | 19.08.2013 | Documents cited: | Search | [X] - STEVENS ET AL, TCP/IP Illustrated, Volume 2: The Implementations, TCP/IP ILLUSTRATED. VOL. 2: THE IMPLEMENTATION, PROFESSIONAL COMPUTING SERIES, READING, MA: ADDISON WESLEY, US, VOL. VOL. 2, (199908), ISBN 0-201-63354-X, XP002182171 [X] 1-28 * page XIX - page XXI * * page 1049 - page 1065 * | [X] - WHITEFANG, "Raw IP Networking FAQ", INTERNET ARTICLE, Internet, (19991111), pages 1 - 7, URL: http://web.archive.org/web/20010203183600/www.whitefang.com/rin/index.html, (20080314), XP002472953 [X] 1-28 * page 4 - page 7 * | [A] - MONTENEGRO ET AL., "RFC 2757 - Long Thin Networks", REQUEST FOR COMMENT, (200001), URL: http://www.ietf.org/rfc/rfc2757.txt?number=2757, (20011105), XP002182001 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * | [A] - SE-JIN HWANG A-RUM JUN HAE-SUN SHIN MYONG-SOON PARK CHANG-EEK CHO SANG-GOO LEE CHONG-TAI KIM, Virtual socket interfaces for wireless network, INFORMATION NETWORKING, 1998. (ICOIN-12). PROCEEDINGS., TWELFTH INTERNATIONAL CONFERENCE ON TOKYO, JAPAN 21-23 JAN. 1998, LOS ALAMITOS, CA, USA,IEEE COMPUT. SOC, US, PAGE(S) 381-384, (1998), ISBN 0-8186-7225-0, XP010265336 [A] 1-28 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ICOIN.1998.648412 | by applicant | - DATA SERVICE OPTIONS FOR SPREAD SPECTRUM SYSTEMS: PACKET DATA SERVICES |