|
06.10.2021 |
Communication regarding the expiry of opposition period |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.12.2020 |
Transmission of the certificate for a European patent pursuant to Rule 74 EPC |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.11.2020 |
Decision to grant a European patent |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Filing of the translations of the claims |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
21.10.2020 |
French translation of claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
German translation of the claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.10.2020 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
15.07.2020 |
Communication of the registration of a transfer or change of name and/or address |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
09.07.2020 |
Submission concerning change of applicant's address |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Bibliographic data of the European patent application |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Communication about intention to grant a European patent according to Board of Appeal decision (from 01-04-2012) |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
29.06.2020 |
Text intended for grant |
Search / examination |
21 |
|
12.06.2020 |
Advice of delivery |
Appeal |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Appeal |
14 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Appeal |
12 |
|
29.05.2020 |
Decision of the Board of Appeal |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
29.05.2020 |
F3032 Notification(s) of the decision |
Appeal |
1 |
|
03.03.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.01.2020 |
F3303.16 Change of composition of the Board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
30.01.2017 |
Composition of the board (T) |
Appeal |
1 |
|
22.08.2016 |
F3204 Communication of the file number to the parties |
Appeal |
1 |
|
25.07.2016 |
Processing of an appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
07.07.2016 |
(Electronic) Receipt |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
07.07.2016 |
Statement of grounds of appeal |
Appeal |
11 |
|
24.05.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Appeal |
1 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Notice of appeal |
Appeal |
2 |
|
12.04.2016 |
Payment of fees and costs |
Appeal |
1 |
|
17.03.2016 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to a communication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (Examining Division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Decision to refuse the application (examining division) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Grounds for the decision (Annex) |
Search / examination |
10 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Means of redress |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Minutes of the oral proceedings (examining division) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
14.03.2016 |
Provision of a copy of the minutes of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
03.02.2016 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.02.2016 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Non-patent literature cited during the examination procedure |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
14.01.2016 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.01.2016 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
28.12.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Cover sheet for fax transmission |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Description |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Letter accompanying subsequently filed items |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
22.12.2015 |
Written submission in preparation to/during oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
29.06.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
25.06.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
23.06.2015 |
Notification concerning the date of oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.05.2015 |
Findings upon submissions relating to oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
12.05.2015 |
Oral proceedings: reply to date proposed |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
29.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
27.04.2015 |
Advice of delivery |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Acknowledgement of a document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Preparation for oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.04.2015 |
Summons to attend oral proceedings |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
26.09.2014 |
Submission concerning representation |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Description |
Search / examination |
9 |
|
28.06.2012 |
Reply to communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Annex to the communication |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
28.02.2012 |
Communication from the Examining Division |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
21.12.2011 |
Final instructions (loss of partial rights) |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
08.09.2011 |
Designation deemed to be withdrawn (non payment of designation fees) |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
02.08.2011 |
Letter concerning fees and payments |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Amended claims filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Amended claims with annotations |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Amended description filed after receipt of (European) search report |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Amended description with annotations |
Search / examination |
6 |
|
20.05.2011 |
Amendments received before examination |
Search / examination |
4 |
|
07.02.2011 |
Reminder period for payment of examination fee/designation fee and correction of deficiencies in Written Opinion/amendment |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
05.01.2011 |
Communication regarding the transmission of the European search report |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
05.01.2011 |
European search opinion |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
05.01.2011 |
European search report |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
20.07.2009 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
29.09.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Letter concerning the priority |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
46 |
|
09.09.2008 |
Priority document |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
15.07.2008 |
Invitation to file priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
09.07.2008 |
Notification of forthcoming publication |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
04.06.2008 |
Confirmation of receipt of (electronically) transmitted priority document |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
02.04.2008 |
Priority document (electronically transmitted) |
Search / examination |
31 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Abstract |
Search / examination |
1 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Claims |
Search / examination |
3 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Description |
Search / examination |
12 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Designation of inventor |
Search / examination |
2 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Drawings |
Search / examination |
5 |
|
01.02.2008 |
Request for grant of a European patent |
Search / examination |
8 |