EP1953705 - Method and system for mitigating errors when processing print stream data [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.10.2021 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.10.2020 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 28.06.2020 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.10.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 10.11.2021 [2021/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. 27 Waterview Drive Shelton, CT 06484 / US | [2020/34] |
Former [2008/32] | For all designated states Pitney Bowes, Inc. One Elmcroft Road Stamford, CT 06926-0700 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sharma, Vishnu Mrs. Arundhati Chakravarty Damyanti Apts. Flat C-103 Behera Sahi Bhubaneshwar, Orissa 751012 / IN | 02 /
Rolling, Patrick 2130 Mount Vernon Road Southington, Connecticut 06489 / US | 03 /
Zamanian, Elaheh E. 23 Applegate Lane Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | 04 /
Zhang, Yichun 1062-A Morden Blush Lane Webster, New York 14580 / US | 05 /
Nethala, Vinod B. 352 Papere Ridge Shelton, Connecticut 06484 / US | [2020/49] |
Former [2008/32] | 01 /
Sharma, Vishnu Mrs. Arundhati Chakravarty Damyanti Apts. Flat C-103 Behera Sahi Bhubaneshwar, Orissa 751012 / IN | ||
02 /
Rolling, Patrick 2130 Mount Vernon Road Southington, Connecticut 06489 / US | |||
03 /
Zamanian, Elaheh E. 23 Applegate Lane Trumbull, Connecticut 06611 / US | |||
04 /
Zhang, Yichun 1062-A Morden Blush Lane Webster, New York 14580 / US | |||
05 /
Nethala, Vinod B. 352 Papere Ridge Shelton, Connecticut 06484 / US | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2020/49] |
Former [2008/32] | HOFFMANN EITLE Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Arabellastrasse 4 81925 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001906.0 | 01.02.2008 | [2008/32] | Priority number, date | US20070899595P | 05.02.2007 Original published format: US 899595 P | US20070799418 | 01.05.2007 Original published format: US 799418 | [2008/33] |
Former [2008/32] | US20070899595P | 05.02.2007 | |
US20070799418 | 01.03.2007 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1953705 | Date: | 06.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/32] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1953705 | Date: | 02.02.2011 | [2011/05] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1953705 | Date: | 02.12.2020 | Language: | EN | [2020/49] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.01.2011 | Classification | IPC: | G07B17/00 | [2008/32] | CPC: |
G07B17/00467 (EP,US);
G06F3/1208 (EP,US);
G06F3/121 (EP,US);
G06F3/1234 (EP);
G06F3/126 (EP,US);
G06F3/1284 (EP,US);
G06F3/1285 (EP);
G07B17/00508 (EP);
G07B2017/0033 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB [2011/40] |
Former [2008/32] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und System zur Fehlerreduzierung beim Verarbeiten von Druckstromdaten | [2008/32] | English: | Method and system for mitigating errors when processing print stream data | [2008/32] | French: | Procédé et système pour remédier aux erreurs lors du traitement de données de flux d'impression | [2008/32] | Examination procedure | 20.05.2011 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.08.2011 | Examination requested [2011/37] | 03.08.2011 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 08.09.2011 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 28.02.2012 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 20.06.2012 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.02.2016 | Date of oral proceedings | 14.03.2016 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination {1} | 14.03.2016 | Minutes of oral proceedings despatched | 29.06.2020 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.10.2020 | Fee for grant paid | 21.10.2020 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.10.2020 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Appeal following examination | 12.04.2016 | Appeal received No. T1900/16 | 07.07.2016 | Statement of grounds filed | 17.04.2020 | Result of appeal procedure: remittal for grant | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 28.02.2012 | Opposition(s) | 03.09.2021 | No opposition filed within time limit [2021/45] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 23.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 27.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 26.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 26.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 27.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 | 27.02.2018 | Renewal fee patent year 11 | 27.02.2019 | Renewal fee patent year 12 | 27.02.2020 | Renewal fee patent year 13 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP0745435 (PITNEY BOWES INC [US]); | [X]US6115132 (NAKATSUMA TAKUJI [JP], et al); | [X]US2002171864 (SESEK ROBERT [US]) | by applicant | US2007179664 |