EP1956811 - Mobile terminal and world time display method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been refused Status updated on 04.08.2017 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.08.2017 | Refusal of application | published on 06.09.2017 [2017/36] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | [N/P] |
Former [2010/01] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yeouido-dong Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 150-721 / KR | ||
Former [2008/33] | For all designated states LG Electronics Inc. 20, Yoido-Dong Yongdungpo-Gu Seoul 150-010 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Choi, Mee-Yeon 219-24, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | 02 /
Chun, Jee-Young 219-24, Gasan-Dong Geumcheon-Gu Seoul / KR | [2008/33] | Representative(s) | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/33] | Katérle, Axel Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Schweigerstraße 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 08001965.6 | 01.02.2008 | [2008/33] | Priority number, date | KR20070012330 | 06.02.2007 Original published format: KR 20070012330 | KR20070033412 | 04.04.2007 Original published format: KR 20070033412 | [2008/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1956811 | Date: | 13.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/33] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP1956811 | Date: | 01.02.2012 | Language: | EN | [2012/05] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.01.2012 | Classification | IPC: | H04M1/725, G04G9/00, G09B29/10 | [2012/05] | CPC: |
G04G9/0076 (EP,US);
H04M1/72427 (EP,US);
G09B29/007 (EP,US);
H04M1/724 (EP,US);
H04M1/72451 (EP,US);
H04M1/72457 (EP,US);
|
Former IPC [2008/33] | H04M1/725 | Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/33] | Title | German: | Mobiles Endgerät und Verfahren zur Anzeige der Weltzeit darauf | [2008/33] | English: | Mobile terminal and world time display method thereof | [2008/33] | French: | Terminal mobile et son procédé d'affichage des horaires mondiaux | [2008/33] | Examination procedure | 01.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/33] | 31.07.2012 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.02.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 17.06.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.03.2017 | Cancellation of oral proceeding that was planned for 05.04.2017 | 05.04.2017 | Date of oral proceedings (cancelled) | 19.04.2017 | Despatch of communication that the application is refused, reason: substantive examination [2017/36] | 29.04.2017 | Application refused, date of legal effect [2017/36] | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 08.02.2016 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 21.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 23.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 22.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 28.02.2017 | 10   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]KR20000027959 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD) [X] 1-3,6,7,11-13,18-21 * figures 1-3 *; | [Y]GB2389017 (NEC CORP [JP]) [Y] 10,16* abstract *; | [X]KR20040073149 (LG ELECTRONICS INC) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13,17,18 * the whole document *; | [X]KR20050017527 (PANTECH CO LTD) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13,17,18 * abstract *; | [XY]KR20060003687 (LG ELECTRONICS INC [KR]) [X] 1-3,5-7,11-13,17-21 * the whole document * [Y] 4,8-10,14-16; | [Y]EP1659817 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 4,8-10,14-16 * paragraph [0015] - paragraph [0020]; figures 1-3 * | Examination | KR20020082614 |