Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101415759B | Global Dossier | 07.07.2014 | B1 | KR20080073569 | 11.08.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20070012330 | 06.02.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | KR101413467B | Global Dossier | 02.07.2014 | B1 | KR20080090195 | 08.10.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20070033412 | 04.04.2007 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN101257693 | 03.09.2008 | A | Priority number | Date | KR20070012330 | 06.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | US8280413 | Global Dossier | 02.10.2012 | B2 | US2008188210 | 07.08.2008 | A1 | Priority number | Date | KR20070033412 | 04.04.2007 | KR20070012330 | 06.02.2007 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1956811 | Global Dossier | 01.02.2012 | A3 | EP1956811 | 13.08.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | KR20070033412 | 04.04.2007 | KR20070012330 | 06.02.2007 |