EP1959036 - Spliceable fibres with built-in break points, use thereof and device for their production [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.09.2010 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.10.2012 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): TR | published on 21.11.2012 [2012/47] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Carl Freudenberg KG Höhnerweg 2-4 69469 Weinheim / DE | [2008/34] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Goffing, Norbert Ostpreussenweg 18 66540 Neunkirchen / DE | 02 /
Löcher, Engelbert Theodor-Storm-Str. 39 67551 Worms / DE | 03 /
Emirze, Ararad Am Stollen 88 67659 Kaiserslautern / DE | 04 /
Klein, Klaus Hauptstr. 2 66887 Föckelberg / DE | [2008/34] | Application number, filing date | 08002085.2 | 05.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | DE20071006758 | 12.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007006758 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959036 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959036 | Date: | 04.11.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/45] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 02.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | D01F8/04, D01D5/30, D01D5/253 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
D01D5/253 (EP,KR,US);
D01D5/30 (EP,KR,US);
D01D4/02 (EP,US);
D01D5/24 (EP,KR,US);
D01F8/04 (EP,US);
Y10T428/2929 (EP,US);
Y10T442/609 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Spleissfähige Fasern mit Sollbruchstellen, deren Verwendung und Vorrichtung zu deren Herstellung | [2008/34] | English: | Spliceable fibres with built-in break points, use thereof and device for their production | [2008/34] | French: | Fibres pouvant être assemblées dotées de points de rupture, leur utilisation et leur dispositif de fabrication | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 08.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/43] | 20.10.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.11.2008 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 29.01.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 25.05.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 22.09.2009 | Fee for grant paid | 22.09.2009 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 05.08.2010 | No opposition filed within time limit [2010/41] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 04.11.2009 | CZ | 04.11.2009 | DK | 04.11.2009 | EE | 04.11.2009 | FI | 04.11.2009 | HR | 04.11.2009 | IE | 04.11.2009 | IT | 04.11.2009 | LT | 04.11.2009 | LV | 04.11.2009 | MT | 04.11.2009 | NL | 04.11.2009 | PL | 04.11.2009 | RO | 04.11.2009 | SE | 04.11.2009 | SI | 04.11.2009 | SK | 04.11.2009 | TR | 04.11.2009 | BG | 04.02.2010 | NO | 04.02.2010 | GR | 05.02.2010 | LU | 05.02.2010 | ES | 15.02.2010 | BE | 28.02.2010 | FR | 01.03.2010 | MC | 01.03.2010 | IS | 04.03.2010 | PT | 04.04.2010 | HU | 05.05.2010 | [2012/47] |
Former [2012/44] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
MT | 04.11.2009 | ||
NL | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
LU | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.04.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/43] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
MT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
LU | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.04.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/42] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
MT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.04.2010 | ||
HU | 05.05.2010 | ||
Former [2012/41] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
MT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
PT | 04.04.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
IT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
MT | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
GR | 05.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
BE | 28.02.2010 | ||
FR | 01.03.2010 | ||
MC | 01.03.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/44] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
CZ | 04.11.2009 | ||
DK | 04.11.2009 | ||
EE | 04.11.2009 | ||
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
IE | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
RO | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
SK | 04.11.2009 | ||
BG | 04.02.2010 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/28] | CY | 04.11.2009 | |
FI | 04.11.2009 | ||
HR | 04.11.2009 | ||
LT | 04.11.2009 | ||
LV | 04.11.2009 | ||
PL | 04.11.2009 | ||
SE | 04.11.2009 | ||
SI | 04.11.2009 | ||
NO | 04.02.2010 | ||
ES | 15.02.2010 | ||
IS | 04.03.2010 | ||
Former [2010/19] | ES | 15.02.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO0029657 (KIMBERLY CLARK CO [US]) [A] 1-13* the whole document *; | [A]WO02077333 (FREUDENBERG CARL KG [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X]US2003039832 (TSUTSUI TOSHIHIKO [JP], et al) [X] 1-11 * the whole document * | by applicant | EP0087292 | US2003039832 |