EP1958817 - Seat suspension bearing system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 25.02.2011 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY 1718 South Concord Street Davenport, Iowa 52808 / US | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states SEARS MANUFACTURING COMPANY 1718 South Concord Street Davenport Iowa 52808 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ropp, Dale 12212 1200 East Street Buda, IL 61314 / US | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2008/34] | Casey, Lindsay Joseph, et al F. R. Kelly & Co. 27 Clyde Road Ballsbridge Dublin 4 / IE | Application number, filing date | 08002106.6 | 05.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | US20070707246 | 13.02.2007 Original published format: US 707246 | [2008/34] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1958817 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1958817 | Date: | 21.04.2010 | Language: | EN | [2010/16] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B60N2/075, B60N2/50, F16C29/02, F16C29/12 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F16C29/02 (EP,US);
B60N2/075 (EP,US);
F16C29/12 (EP,US);
B60N2205/20 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/34] | Title | German: | Sitzabfederungs-Lagersystem | [2008/34] | English: | Seat suspension bearing system | [2008/34] | French: | Système de glissière à palier réglable pour suspension de siège | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 20.02.2009 | Examination requested [2009/15] | 23.03.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 05.08.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.11.2009 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 02.02.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 02.02.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 24.01.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2011/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | AT | 21.04.2010 | BE | 21.04.2010 | CZ | 21.04.2010 | DK | 21.04.2010 | EE | 21.04.2010 | FI | 21.04.2010 | HR | 21.04.2010 | HU | 21.04.2010 | IT | 21.04.2010 | LT | 21.04.2010 | LV | 21.04.2010 | MT | 21.04.2010 | NL | 21.04.2010 | PL | 21.04.2010 | PT | 21.04.2010 | RO | 21.04.2010 | SE | 21.04.2010 | SI | 21.04.2010 | SK | 21.04.2010 | TR | 21.04.2010 | CY | 02.06.2010 | BG | 21.07.2010 | NO | 21.07.2010 | GR | 22.07.2010 | ES | 01.08.2010 | IS | 21.08.2010 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
TR | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 21.07.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/42] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
BG | 21.07.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2013/32] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PT | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2012/05] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
MT | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2011/25] | AT | 21.04.2010 | |
BE | 21.04.2010 | ||
CZ | 21.04.2010 | ||
DK | 21.04.2010 | ||
EE | 21.04.2010 | ||
FI | 21.04.2010 | ||
HR | 21.04.2010 | ||
IT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LT | 21.04.2010 | ||
LV | 21.04.2010 | ||
NL | 21.04.2010 | ||
PL | 21.04.2010 | ||
RO | 21.04.2010 | ||
SE | 21.04.2010 | ||
SI | 21.04.2010 | ||
SK | 21.04.2010 | ||
CY | 02.06.2010 | ||
NO | 21.07.2010 | ||
GR | 22.07.2010 | ||
ES | 01.08.2010 | ||
IS | 21.08.2010 | ||
Former [2010/45] | NL | 21.04.2010 | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]GB899151 (JOSEPH NAGY) [X] 1-5 * the whole document * [A] 6,7; | [A]US5584460 (ROPP DALE [US]) [A] 1,7 * abstract ** column 2, line 3 - line 59; figure 2 *; | [AD]US5938340 (BRODERSEN COLE T [US]) [AD] 1,2,7 * abstract * * column 2, line 29 - column 3, line 6; figures 1-4 *; | [XA]US6264180 (ROPP DALE [US]) [X] 1,3 * abstract * * column 2, line 30 - line 58 * * column 3, line 41 - line 49; figures 1-3,7 * [A] 2,4-7 | by applicant | US5938340 |