EP1959158 - Method for customising an oscillation isolation system [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 08.06.2018 Database last updated on 20.07.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 30.06.2017 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.04.2017 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.06.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 11.07.2018 [2018/28] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Integrated Dynamics Engineering GmbH Hermannstraße 9-13 65479 Raunheim / DE | [2017/26] |
Former [2008/34] | For all designated states Integrated Dynamics Engineering GmbH Karl-Liebknecht-Strasse 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Heiland, Peter Karl-Liebknecht-Straße 30 65479 Raunheim / DE | [2008/34] | Representative(s) | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte PartG mbB Alexandrastraße 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2017/31] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe PatentConsult Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | ||
Former [2008/34] | Herden, Andreas F. Blumbach - Zinngrebe Patentanwälte Alexandrastrasse 5 65187 Wiesbaden / DE | Application number, filing date | 08002729.5 | 14.02.2008 | [2008/34] | Priority number, date | DE20071007911 | 14.02.2007 Original published format: DE102007007911 | [2008/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1959158 | Date: | 20.08.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1959158 | Date: | 02.08.2017 | Language: | DE | [2017/31] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.05.2008 | Classification | IPC: | F16F15/02, G03F7/20, G10K11/175 | [2008/34] | CPC: |
F16F15/02 (EP,US);
G03F7/709 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL [2017/31] |
Former [2009/18] | CH, DE, GB, LI, NL | ||
Former [2008/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Anpassung eines Schwingungsisolationssystems | [2008/34] | English: | Method for customising an oscillation isolation system | [2008/34] | French: | Procédé destiné à l'adaptation d'un système d'isolation des vibrations | [2008/34] | Examination procedure | 16.09.2008 | Examination requested [2008/45] | 14.11.2008 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 21.02.2009 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 16.04.2009 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 18.05.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 12.06.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 07.12.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 26.05.2011 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 24.11.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.10.2015 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.10.2015 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 04.01.2016 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 31.05.2016 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.04.2017 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 14.06.2017 | Fee for grant paid | 14.06.2017 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 14.06.2017 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 14.11.2008 | Opposition(s) | 03.05.2018 | No opposition filed within time limit [2018/28] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 25.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 25.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | 24.02.2015 | Renewal fee patent year 08 | 24.02.2016 | Renewal fee patent year 09 | 24.02.2017 | Renewal fee patent year 10 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US6002987 (KAMIYA SABURO [JP], et al) [X] 1-3 * abstract *; | [X]JP2001023881 (CANON KK) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US6477908 (WAKUI SHINJI [JP]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US6450288 (AKIYAMA KYOICHI [JP], et al) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US5508518 (KENDALL RODNEY A [US]) [X] 1,2 * abstract *; | [X]US2003058417 (NAGAHASHI YOSHITOMO [JP]) [X] 1 * paragraph [0026]; figure - *; | [A]US5917919 (ROSENTHAL FELIX [US]) [A] * column 1, line 44 - line 50 * | Examination | US2003029670 | by applicant | DE69817750T | - ANDRES LARRAZA; BRUCE DENARDO, "An acoustic Casimir effect", PHYS. LETT. A, (1998), vol. 348, pages 151 - 155 | - D. GUICKING; M. WENZEL, "Adaptive Filter Concept for Active Control of Acoustic Wall Impedance", ASME PAPER 86-WA/NCA-28, (198612), page 3 | - M. WENZEL; D. GUICKING, "Konzept zur aktiven Reflexionsfaktorregelung mit adaptiven Digitalfiltern.", FORTSCHRITTE DER AKUSTIK, DAGA '87 (AACHEN). DPG-GMBH, (1987), pages 505 - 508 |