EP2090944 - Printer and method for wireless RFID-based internal components data recording [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 31.08.2012 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 31.08.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 03.10.2012 [2012/40] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Dirsch, Bernhard Westerwaldweg 27 91056 Erlangen / DE | 02 /
Karl, Stephan Hindenburgstrasse 52 85072 Eichstätt / DE | 03 /
Rettner, Lothar Reinschartenweg 14 91056 Erlangen / DE | 04 /
Schlinkert, Jochen Starenstrasse 15 91315 Höchstadt/Aisch / DE | [2009/34] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2011/43] | Application number, filing date | 08002770.9 | 14.02.2008 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090944 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090944 | Date: | 26.10.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/43] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G05B19/418, G03G15/00, B65H18/28, B41J2/01 | [2009/34] | CPC: |
G05B19/042 (EP,US);
B41J29/393 (EP,US);
G03G15/55 (EP,US);
G03G21/1657 (EP,US);
G03G2221/1663 (EP,US);
G05B2219/25093 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | DE [2010/17] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Druckmaschinen und Verfahren zur kabellosen Datenerfassung von den mit RFID ausgestattenen internen Komponenten | [2009/34] | English: | Printer and method for wireless RFID-based internal components data recording | [2009/34] | French: | Imprimante et méthode pour communication sans fil avec ses composants internes équipés de RFID | [2009/34] | Examination procedure | 08.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 20.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 27.05.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 05.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 06.12.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 16.05.2011 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 05.09.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 05.09.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 03.03.2010 | Opposition(s) | 27.07.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/40] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]EP1060895 (EASTMAN KODAK CO [US]) [X] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]US5491540 (HIRST B MARK [US]) [Y] 1-17 * the whole document *; | [Y]EP1647406 (HEWLETT PACKARD DEVELOPMENT CO [US]) [Y] 1-17 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] *; | [X]US2004239706 (KAWAKAMI KUNIO [JP]) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0020] - [0034] , [0036] , [0047] , [0051]; figures 6A,6B,7B,8 *; | [X]US2003025027 (EBISAWA RYOJI [JP], et al) [X] 1-17 * paragraphs [0001] - [0034] - [0074] - [0076]; figure 6 *; | [A]US2007063013 (MAROWSKI RAYMOND M [US], et al) [A] 1-17 * the whole document * | Examination | DE10300071 | by applicant | EP1060895 |