EP2090946 - Method and device for receiving and transmitting signals for safety-oriented automation components [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2009/34] | Device for receiving and transmitting signals for error-proof automation components and device | ||
[2010/46] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 10.02.2012 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 10.02.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit | published on 14.03.2012 [2012/11] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/34] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Gramolla, Tobias Dahlienweg 6 92245 Kümmersbruck / DE | 02 /
König, Mathias Bärnhof 90 91284 Neuhaus an der Pegnitz / DE | 03 /
Maier, Mario Asamstrasse 46 92266 Ensdorf / DE | 04 /
Mark, Reinhard Edenseestrasse 2 91217 Hersbruck / DE | 05 /
Sigwart, Edgar Wittelsbacherstrasse 12 92224 Amberg / DE | 06 /
Singer, Monika Von-Loefen-Strasse 20 92263 Ebermannsdorf / DE | [2009/34] | Application number, filing date | 08002772.5 | 14.02.2008 | [2009/34] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2090946 | Date: | 19.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/34] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2090946 | Date: | 06.04.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/14] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G05B19/042, G08C19/02 | [2010/46] | CPC: |
G05B19/0425 (EP);
G05B9/02 (EP);
G05B2219/21163 (EP);
G05B2219/24035 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2009/34] | G05B19/042, G05B9/02, G05B19/048, G05B19/05, G06F11/00, G01R31/04 | Designated contracting states | DE, FR, GB, IT [2010/17] |
Former [2009/34] | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | Title | German: | Verfahren und Vorrichtung zum Erfassen und Aussenden von Signalen bei fehlersicheren Automatisierungskomponenten | [2010/46] | English: | Method and device for receiving and transmitting signals for safety-oriented automation components | [2010/46] | French: | Procédé et dispositif d'enregistrement et d'émission de signaux dans des composants d'automatisation sécurisés | [2010/46] |
Former [2009/34] | Verfahren zum Erfassen und Aussenden von Signalen bei fehlersicheren Automatisierungskomponenten und Vorrichtung | ||
Former [2009/34] | Device for receiving and transmitting signals for error-proof automation components and device | ||
Former [2009/34] | Procédé d'enregistrement et d'émission de signaux dans des composants d'automatisation protégés contres les erreurs et dispositif | Examination procedure | 08.02.2010 | Examination requested [2010/11] | 20.02.2010 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: designated state(s) | 03.03.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 30.03.2010 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: designated state(s) AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DK, EE, ES, FI, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR | 30.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 02.11.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.02.2011 | Fee for grant paid | 21.02.2011 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 10.01.2012 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/11] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAY]DE10127056 (BOSCH GMBH ROBERT [DE]) [X] 1,2,8-14,17,18 * paragraphs [0001] - [0003] - [0010] , [0014] , [0018]; figures 1,3,5 * [A] 19 [Y] 3-7,15,16; | [YA]US4155116 (BOLLARD ROBERT [US], et al) [Y] 3-7,15,16 * columns 3-4; figure 3 * [A] 1,2,8-14,17-19; | [XA]EP1034986 (DAIMLER CHRYSLER AG [DE]) [X] 1 * the whole document * [A] 2-19; | [A]EP1594021 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [A] 1-19 * the whole document * | Examination | WO2008015096 | by applicant | WO2008015096 | DE10127561 | US4155116 |