EP1972380 - Method for adjusting sedimentation rates of blood or bone marrow [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.03.2010 Database last updated on 20.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.03.2010 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.04.2010 [2010/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Harvest Technologies Corporation 40 Grissom Road, Suite, No. 100 Plymouth Massachusetts 02360 / US | [2008/39] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Ellsworth, James R. c/o 40 Grissom Road Suite 100 Plymouth MA 02360 / US | 02 /
Kevy, Sherwin c/o 40 Grissom Road Suite 100 Plymouth MA 02360 / US | 03 /
Jacobsen, May c/o 40 Grissom Road Suite 100 Plymouth MA 02360 / US | [2008/39] | Representative(s) | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson LLP 57-59 High Street Twyford, Berkshire RG10 9AJ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2008/39] | Crouch, David John, et al Bromhead Johnson 19 Buckingham Street London WC2N 6EF / GB | Application number, filing date | 08002831.9 | 15.02.2008 | [2008/39] | Priority number, date | US20070901660P | 16.02.2007 Original published format: US 901660 P | [2008/39] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1972380 | Date: | 24.09.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/39] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 19.08.2008 | Classification | IPC: | B03D3/00 | [2008/39] | CPC: |
G01N1/38 (EP,US);
G01N33/49 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/39] | Title | German: | Verfahren zur Einstellung von Sedimentationsraten von Blut oder Knochenmark | [2008/39] | English: | Method for adjusting sedimentation rates of blood or bone marrow | [2008/39] | French: | Procédé de réglage de taux de sédimentation du sang ou de la moelle osseuse | [2008/39] | Examination procedure | 19.03.2009 | Examination requested [2009/18] | 17.04.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 28.10.2009 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2010/16] | 04.12.2009 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2010/16] |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US5614106 (PAYRAT JEAN M [BE], et al) [X] 1,4,6-8* column 13, line 9 - column 19, line 51; figures 8,11 * | by applicant | US6398972 |