Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03095924 | Global Dossier | 20.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1442263 | Global Dossier | 04.08.2004 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | GB0125946 | 29.10.2001 | GB0205104 | 29.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002343014 | Global Dossier | 12.05.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | GB0125946 | 29.10.2001 | GB0205104 | 29.10.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | AU2002343010 | Global Dossier | 11.11.2003 | A1 | Priority number | Date | GB0205084 | 08.11.2002 | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP1975539 | Global Dossier | 01.10.2008 | A2 | Priority number | Date | EP02779673 | 29.10.2002 | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | GB0125946 | 29.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0125946D0 | 19.12.2001 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0125946 | 29.10.2001 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | GB0210794D0 | 19.06.2002 | D0 | Priority number | Date | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO03038363 | Global Dossier | 24.07.2003 | A3 | WO03038363 | 08.05.2003 | A2 | Priority number | Date | GB0210794 | 10.05.2002 | GB0125946 | 29.10.2001 | Type | Earlier application | EP1442263 |