EP1975539 - Heat exchangers [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 23.04.2010 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.04.2010 | Withdrawal of application | published on 26.05.2010 [2010/21] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states CHART HEAT EXCHANGERS Limited Partnership Wobaston Road, Fordhouses Wolverhampton WV10 6QB / GB | [2008/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Symonds, Keith Thomas 4 Lansdowne Avenue Codsall Staffordshire WV8 2EN / GB | 02 /
Chatwin, Christopher John 2 Bartlett Close Penkridge Stafford ST 19 5JG / GB | [2008/40] | Representative(s) | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al Avidity IP Kestrel House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2009/45] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw Merlin House Falconry Court Baker's Lane Epping, Essex CM16 5DQ / GB | ||
Former [2008/40] | Moore, Christopher Mark, et al HLBBshaw 10th Floor, Metropolitan House 1 Hagley Road Birmingham B16 8TG / GB | Application number, filing date | 08002834.3 | 29.10.2002 | [2008/40] | Priority number, date | GB20010025946 | 29.10.2001 Original published format: GB 0125946 | GB20020010794 | 10.05.2002 Original published format: GB 0210794 | [2008/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP1975539 | Date: | 01.10.2008 | Language: | EN | [2008/40] | Classification | IPC: | F28F3/02, F28F3/08 | [2008/40] | CPC: |
F28F3/086 (EP);
F28F13/06 (EP);
F28F3/025 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, IE, IT, LI, LU, MC, NL, PT, SE, SK, TR [2008/40] | Title | German: | Wärmetauscher | [2008/40] | English: | Heat exchangers | [2008/40] | French: | Échangeurs thermiques | [2008/40] | Examination procedure | 15.02.2008 | Examination requested [2008/40] | 15.04.2010 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2010/21] | Parent application(s) Tooltip | EP02779673.9 / EP1442263 | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 15.02.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 14.10.2008 | Renewal fee patent year 07 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.10.2009 | 08   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | by applicant | WO0034728 |