EP1983365 - Data carrier with display [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2008/43] | Electronic display and data carrier with display | ||
[2012/19] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 17.05.2013 Database last updated on 30.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 17.07.2015 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU, LU | published on 19.08.2015 [2015/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Giesecke & Devrient GmbH Prinzregentenstrasse 159 81677 München / DE | [2008/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Graf, Hans Hochgernstrasse 3 83026 Rosenheim / DE | 02 /
Kluge, Stefan Allacherstrasse 98 80997 München / DE | [2008/43] | Representative(s) | (deleted) | [2012/28] | Application number, filing date | 08003258.4 | 22.02.2008 | [2008/43] | Priority number, date | DE20071018770 | 20.04.2007 Original published format: DE102007018770 | [2008/43] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP1983365 | Date: | 22.10.2008 | Language: | DE | [2008/43] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP1983365 | Date: | 11.07.2012 | Language: | DE | [2012/28] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.06.2008 | Classification | IPC: | G02F1/01 | [2008/43] | CPC: |
G02F1/0147 (EP,US);
G09F3/0294 (EP);
G02F1/167 (EP,US)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2008/43] | Title | German: | Datenträger mit Display | [2012/19] | English: | Data carrier with display | [2012/19] | French: | Support de données avec affichage | [2012/19] |
Former [2008/43] | Elektronische Display und Datenträger mit Display | ||
Former [2008/43] | Electronic display and data carrier with display | ||
Former [2008/43] | Affichage électronique et support de données avec affichage | Examination procedure | 22.04.2009 | Examination requested [2009/23] | 25.05.2009 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 08.09.2009 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 27.08.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | 20.01.2011 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.04.2012 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 25.05.2012 | Fee for grant paid | 25.05.2012 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Divisional application(s) | The date of the Examining Division's first communication in respect of the earliest application for which a communication has been issued is 25.05.2009 | Opposition(s) | 12.04.2013 | No opposition filed within time limit [2013/25] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 01.03.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | HU | 22.02.2008 | CY | 11.07.2012 | CZ | 11.07.2012 | DK | 11.07.2012 | EE | 11.07.2012 | FI | 11.07.2012 | HR | 11.07.2012 | IT | 11.07.2012 | LT | 11.07.2012 | LV | 11.07.2012 | MT | 11.07.2012 | NL | 11.07.2012 | PL | 11.07.2012 | RO | 11.07.2012 | SE | 11.07.2012 | SI | 11.07.2012 | SK | 11.07.2012 | TR | 11.07.2012 | BG | 11.10.2012 | NO | 11.10.2012 | GR | 12.10.2012 | IS | 11.11.2012 | PT | 12.11.2012 | AT | 22.02.2013 | IE | 22.02.2013 | LU | 22.02.2013 | BE | 28.02.2013 | CH | 28.02.2013 | LI | 28.02.2013 | MC | 28.02.2013 | [2015/34] |
Former [2015/32] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
TR | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/32] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
MT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/24] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
AT | 22.02.2013 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/07] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
IE | 22.02.2013 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2014/06] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
BE | 28.02.2013 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/48] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
CH | 28.02.2013 | ||
LI | 28.02.2013 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/42] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
MC | 28.02.2013 | ||
Former [2013/34] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
BG | 11.10.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/23] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
IT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
RO | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
SK | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/22] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
CZ | 11.07.2012 | ||
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
EE | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/21] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
DK | 11.07.2012 | ||
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/15] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
NL | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/13] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
PT | 12.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/12] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SE | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/11] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
LV | 11.07.2012 | ||
PL | 11.07.2012 | ||
SI | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
GR | 12.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/10] | CY | 11.07.2012 | |
FI | 11.07.2012 | ||
HR | 11.07.2012 | ||
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
IS | 11.11.2012 | ||
Former [2013/09] | FI | 11.07.2012 | |
LT | 11.07.2012 | ||
NO | 11.10.2012 | ||
Former [2013/08] | LT | 11.07.2012 | |
NO | 11.10.2012 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2004053786 (KONINKL PHILIPS ELECTRONICS NV [NL], et al) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]JP2000335149 (DAINIPPON PRINTING CO LTD) [A] 1-11 * the whole document *; | [A]US2002097777 (RONCI MICHAEL BENJAMIN [US]) [A] 1-6 * the whole document * | Examination | JPH05185792 | US4922242 | by applicant | WO2004053786 |