EP2093787 - Connecting component for connecting a contactor with an output switch [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 02.12.2011 Database last updated on 13.09.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 04.10.2013 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): HU | published on 06.11.2013 [2013/45] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Werner-von-Siemens-Str. 1 DE-80333 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2009/35] | For all designated states SIEMENS AKTIENGESELLSCHAFT Wittelsbacherplatz 2 80333 München / DE | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Bodenmeier, Martin Im Koch 15 92711 Parkstein / DE | [2009/35] | Application number, filing date | 08003289.9 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/35] | Filing language | DE | Procedural language | DE | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP2093787 | Date: | 26.08.2009 | Language: | DE | [2009/35] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP2093787 | Date: | 26.01.2011 | Language: | DE | [2011/04] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2008 | Classification | IPC: | H01H89/06, H01H71/08 | [2009/35] | CPC: |
H01H89/06 (EP);
H01H71/082 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/35] | Title | German: | Verbindungsteil zum Verbinden eines Schützes mit einem Leistungsschalter | [2009/35] | English: | Connecting component for connecting a contactor with an output switch | [2009/35] | French: | Elément de liaison destiné à relier un contacteur avec un disjoncteur | [2009/35] | Examination procedure | 18.01.2010 | Examination requested [2010/08] | 17.02.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 09.04.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.04.2010 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 12.07.2010 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 17.08.2010 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 06.12.2010 | Fee for grant paid | 06.12.2010 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | Opposition(s) | 27.10.2011 | No opposition filed within time limit [2012/01] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CY | 26.01.2011 | CZ | 26.01.2011 | DK | 26.01.2011 | EE | 26.01.2011 | FI | 26.01.2011 | HR | 26.01.2011 | HU | 26.01.2011 | IE | 26.01.2011 | LT | 26.01.2011 | LV | 26.01.2011 | MT | 26.01.2011 | NL | 26.01.2011 | PL | 26.01.2011 | RO | 26.01.2011 | SE | 26.01.2011 | SI | 26.01.2011 | SK | 26.01.2011 | TR | 26.01.2011 | LU | 22.02.2011 | BE | 28.02.2011 | MC | 28.02.2011 | BG | 26.04.2011 | NO | 26.04.2011 | GR | 27.04.2011 | ES | 07.05.2011 | IS | 26.05.2011 | PT | 26.05.2011 | [2013/45] |
Former [2013/44] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
TR | 26.01.2011 | ||
LU | 22.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2013/25] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
LU | 22.02.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/05] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
MT | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2012/01] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
BE | 28.02.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/49] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
CZ | 26.01.2011 | ||
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
RO | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
SK | 26.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/47] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
DK | 26.01.2011 | ||
EE | 26.01.2011 | ||
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
IE | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/41] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
MC | 28.02.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/38] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
NL | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/37] | CY | 26.01.2011 | |
FI | 26.01.2011 | ||
HR | 26.01.2011 | ||
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
SI | 26.01.2011 | ||
BG | 26.04.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | ||
Former [2011/36] | HR | 26.01.2011 | |
LT | 26.01.2011 | ||
LV | 26.01.2011 | ||
PL | 26.01.2011 | ||
SE | 26.01.2011 | ||
NO | 26.04.2011 | ||
GR | 27.04.2011 | ||
ES | 07.05.2011 | ||
IS | 26.05.2011 | ||
PT | 26.05.2011 | Documents cited: | Search | [AD]EP0588712 (TELEMECANIQUE [FR]); | [XY]DE10224976 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [X] 1,3,4 * paragraphs [0005] , [0006] , [0029] , [0033]; figure 8 * [Y] 2; | [Y]EP1837887 (SIEMENS AG [DE]) [Y] 2 * paragraph [0002]; figures 4,5 * | by applicant | EP0588712 |