EP2019366 - RFID tag mounting package and manufacturing method thereof [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 20.02.2015 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.02.2015 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 25.03.2015 [2015/13] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [N/P] |
Former [2009/05] | For all designated states Hitachi, Ltd. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
Sakama, Isao c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chioyda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | 02 /
Tachibana, Koichi c/o Hitachi, Ltd. Intellectual Property Group 12F, Marunouchi Center Building 6-1, Marunouchi 1-chome Chioyda-ku Tokyo 100-8220 / JP | [2009/05] | Representative(s) | Strehl Schübel-Hopf & Partner Maximilianstrasse 54 80538 München / DE | [2009/05] | Application number, filing date | 08003308.7 | 22.02.2008 | [2009/05] | Priority number, date | JP20070193002 | 25.07.2007 Original published format: JP 2007193002 | [2009/05] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP2019366 | Date: | 28.01.2009 | Language: | EN | [2009/05] | Type: | A3 Search report | No.: | EP2019366 | Date: | 05.03.2014 | Language: | EN | [2014/10] | Search report(s) | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.01.2014 | Classification | IPC: | G06K19/077 | [2009/05] | CPC: |
B42D25/00 (KR);
G06K19/07 (KR);
G06K19/077 (KR);
G06K19/07749 (EP,US);
G06K19/07756 (EP,US);
G06K19/0776 (EP,US);
G06K19/07794 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, SE, SI, SK, TR [2009/05] | Title | German: | RFID-Etikett-Montagepaket und Herstellungsverfahren dafür | [2009/05] | English: | RFID tag mounting package and manufacturing method thereof | [2009/05] | French: | Ensemble de montage d'étiquette RFID et procédé de fabrication correspondant | [2009/05] | Examination procedure | 31.03.2008 | Examination requested [2009/05] | 06.09.2014 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2015/13] | 16.10.2014 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2015/13] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.02.2010 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.02.2011 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2012 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | 27.02.2013 | Renewal fee patent year 06 | 20.02.2014 | Renewal fee patent year 07 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2007048589 (GIESECKE & DEVRIENT GMBH [DE], et al) [A] 1-13 * figure 22 * | by applicant | JP2002049905 | JP2005309811 |